EP1948077 - INTRAGASTRIC SPACE FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ReShape Medical, Inc. 236 Avenida Fabricante, Suite 201 San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/14] | For all designated states ReShape Medical Corporation 236 Avenida Fabricante, Suite 201 San Clemente CA 92672 / US | ||
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states ReShape Medical Corporation 26429 Rancho Parkway South Suite 140 Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states ReShape Medical Corporation 26429 Rancho Parkway South Suite 140 Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAGG, Andrew, H. 5024 Bruce Place Edina, MN 55424 / US | 02 /
QUIJANO, Rodolfo, C. 27451 Lost Trail Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US | 03 /
PURKAIT, Bobby 2995 East Valley Road Santa Barbara, CA 93108 / US | 04 /
TU, Hosheng 15 Riez Newport Beach, California 92657 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Stephen, Robert John, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Stephen, Robert John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Stephen, Robert John, et al Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 06827314.3 | 31.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US42711 | Priority number, date | US20050263302 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: US 263302 | US20050262614 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: US 262614 | US20050315925 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 315925 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007053707 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948077 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948077 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/04, A61F5/00 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
A61F5/003 (EP);
A61F5/0033 (EP);
A61F5/0036 (EP);
A61F5/0043 (EP);
A61F2002/044 (EP);
A61F2005/002 (EP);
A61F2005/0023 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | A61F2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAGASTRISCHER RAUMFÜLLER | [2008/31] | English: | INTRAGASTRIC SPACE FILLER | [2008/31] | French: | LEST INTRAGASTRIQUE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 07.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15198773.2 / EP3056173 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2006 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | IS | 23.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.10.2006 | |
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2004186502 ; | [A]US6746460 ; | [A]US4485805 ; | [A]US2005119674 |