EP1943763 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED DATA THROUGHPUT IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, XiangyIng 5417 Nw 150th Pl Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
VENKATACHALAM, Muthaiah 1441 Ne Carlaby Way Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06827420.8 | 02.11.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006US42898 | Priority number, date | US20050267608 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 267608 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007056107 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1943763 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943763 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/18 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
H04L1/188 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/1867 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES DATENDURCHSATZES IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK | [2008/29] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED DATA THROUGHPUT IN A WIRELESS NETWORK | [2008/29] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODE DESTINES A AMELIORER LE DEBIT DE DONNEES DANS UN RESEAU SANS FIL | [2010/21] |
Former [2008/29] | SYSTEMES ET TECHNIQUES DESTINES A AMELIORER LE DEBIT DE DONNEES DANS UN RESEAU SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2010 | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | IT | 20.10.2010 | LT | 20.10.2010 | LV | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | PL | 20.10.2010 | RO | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | IE | 02.11.2010 | LU | 02.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | FR | 20.12.2010 | BG | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | IS | 20.02.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | HU | 21.04.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
LU | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 20.12.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
HU | 21.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 20.12.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
HU | 21.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 20.12.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 20.12.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 20.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0067498 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-5,9-13,17-21,25-28 * page 10, lines 2-21 *; | [A]WO03019805 (ENSEMBLE COMM INC [US]) [A] 1-5,9-13,17-21,25-28* abstract *; | [PX]WO2006007025 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-5,9-13,17-21,25-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] *; | [X] - ABETA S ET AL, "Broadband packet wireless access incorporating high-speed ip packet transmission", VTC 2002-FALL. 2002 IEEE 56TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. VANCOUVER, CANADA, SEPT. 24 - 28, 2002, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020924), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 56, ISBN 0-7803-7467-3, pages 844 - 848, XP010608932 [X] 1-5,9-13,17-21,25-28 * Page 846, section IV and Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2002.1040719 | [X] - JUNGNAM YUN ET AL, "Adaptive resource allocations for D-TDD systems in wireless cellular networks", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2004. MILCOM 2004. 2004 IEEE MONTEREY, CA, USA 31 OCT. - 3 NOV. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041031), ISBN 0-7803-8847-X, pages 1047 - 1053, XP010825829 [X] 1-5,9-13,17-21,25-28 * Pages 1048-1049, section II, paragraphs A, C and D * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2004.1494992 |