EP1948522 - CONTINUOUSLY SEALING ONE WAY VALVE ASSEMBLY AND FLUID DELIVERY SYSTEM FORMULATIONS FOR USE THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reseal International Limited Partnership 445 Park Ave, Suite 900 New York, NY 10022 / US | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREG, Pardes 425 East 58th Street Suite 36G New York, NY 10022 / US | 02 /
SWISS, Stewart 21 Abbington Drive Lloyd Harbor, NY 11743 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06827438.0 | 03.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US42940 | Priority number, date | US20050267868 | 03.11.2005 Original published format: US 267868 | US20060823462P | 24.08.2006 Original published format: US 823462 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007056131 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1948522 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/38 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
B65D47/205 (EP,US);
B65D5/72 (KR);
B65D47/18 (EP,US);
Y02W30/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | B65D5/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICH ABDICHTENDE EINWEGEVENTILANORDNUNG UND FLUIDABGABESYSTEM SOWIE FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG DARIN | [2008/31] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY SEALING ONE WAY VALVE ASSEMBLY AND FLUID DELIVERY SYSTEM FORMULATIONS FOR USE THEREIN | [2008/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE A SOUPAPE UNIDIRECTIONNELLE A ETANCHEITE EN CONTINU ET SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE, ET FORMULATIONS POUR L'UTILISATION | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5305786 (DEBUSH GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9-13 * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 44; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,14,15 [I] 7; | [Y]GB773955 (MARCUS LEONARD SILVER) [Y] 3 * page 1, lines 60-62; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4099651 (VON WINCKELMANN EMIL H) [Y] 4 * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE3829356 (SANNER FRIEDR GMBH CO KG [DE]) [Y] 4 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO9415848 (RESEAL INT LP [US]) [Y] 6 * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5305783 (DEBUSH GEORGE [US]) [Y] 8 * column 6, lines 3-8 *; | [Y]WO2004067400 (GAPLAST GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 14 * claims 22,23 *; | [Y]EP0172711 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [Y] 15 * page 5, lines 25-28 *; | [A]EP0302575 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [A] 14 * page 3, lines 23-41 * | International search | [A]US6896151 (ROBINSON PHILIP J [US]); | [A]US6662977 (GERBER BERNARD R [US], et al); | [A]US5092855 (PARDES GREG [US]); | [A]US5836484 (GERBER BERNARD R [US]) | by applicant | USRE34243E | US5305786 |