EP1952252 - INFORMATION CAPTURE, PROCESSING AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xtraprise L.P. 3841 Wentwood Drive Dallas, TX 75225 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARVEY, Tony S. 2612 Clayton Ave. West Lafayette, Indiana 47906-1520 / US | 02 /
O'NEILL, John C. 3841 Wentwood Drive Dallas, Texas 75225 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Epping, Wilhelm, et al Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06827488.5 | 03.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US43057 | Priority number, date | US20050733368P | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 733368 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007056196 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952252 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063118 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G07C1/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | G06F15/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ERFASSEN, VERARBEITEN UND ABRUFEN VON INFORMATIONEN UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/32] | English: | INFORMATION CAPTURE, PROCESSING AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2008/32] | French: | SYSTEME DE SAISIE, DE TRAITEMENT, ET DE RECUPERATION D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION DE CE SYSTEME | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 17.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [X]US2004260601 (BRIEF VICTOR [US]); | [A]US6408337 (DIETZ JANICE GOLD [US], et al); | [A]US6249715 (YURI HIDETAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US5970475 (BARNES ROBERT L [US], et al) |