EP1955289 - SECURITY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRA Gesellschaft für Asset Management mbH & Co. KG Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOBBE, Anatoli Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Körner, Peter Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Körner, Peter Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 06828560.0 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006DE02095 | Priority number, date | DE20051056854 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005056854 | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007059764 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955289 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
G07C9/00896 (EP,US);
G07C9/27 (EP,US);
G08B29/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/11] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SICHERUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/33] | English: | SECURITY SYSTEM | [2008/33] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6505774 (FULCHER ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 11, line 51 - line 61 * * column 14, line 60 - column 15, line 12 * * column 19, line 51 - column 22, line 48 * * figure 9 *; | [X]DE4026439 (TRIOVING AS [NO]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 39 - column 5, line 30 * * figure - *; | [X]WO2004034336 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line L * * figure - *; | [X]EP0320373 (LEWINER JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 36 * * figure - *; | [PX]EP1628411 (COMPUTERIZED SECURITY SYSTEMS [US]) [PX] 1-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0028] * * figure - *; | [A]US2004083128 (BUCKINGHAM DUANE W [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0060] * * figure - *; | [A]FR2050138 (RETY STEPHEN) [A] 1,19 * figure 3 * * page 4, line 2 - line 15 * * page 6, line 2 - line 11 * | by applicant | US6505774 | DE4026439 | WO2004034336 | EP0320373 |