EP1963655 - PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENZ, Arnold Alte Dorfstrasse 15/1 73773 Aichwald / DE | 02 /
KOLLOTZEK, Helmut Albstrasse 14 73557 Mutlangen / DE | 03 /
LEITL, Markus Wolfäckerstrasse 32 73630 Remshalden / DE | 04 /
SCHILLING, Sven Winnender Strasse 33 71404 Korb / DE | 05 /
LIMBACH, Ernst Benzstrasse 15/1 73630 Remshalden / DE | 06 /
ZVONKOVIC, Josip Ziegeleistrasse 35 71384 Weinstadt / DE | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Stumkat, Ulrich, et al Mahle International GmbH Patent Department CRP Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Pohle, Reinhard, et al Mahle International GmbH Patentabteilung ZRIP Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06828686.3 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006DE02255 | Priority number, date | DE20051061075 | 21.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061075 | [2008/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007073719 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1963655 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02F3/22, B22C9/10, B22D15/02 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F02F3/22 (EP,KR,US);
B22C9/10 (KR);
B22C9/105 (EP,US);
B22D15/02 (KR);
B22D19/0009 (EP,US);
B22D19/0027 (EP,US);
B22D21/007 (EP,US);
B22D29/002 (EP,US);
F02F2200/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/38] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOLBEN FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2008/36] | English: | PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING IT | [2008/36] | French: | PISTON POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT PISTON | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 22.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JPS585455 (RIKEN KK) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 5 [I] 3; | [Y]GB2349195 (SENECA TECH LTD [GB]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [PX]WO2006014741 (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-5 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10003821 (KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 6 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH03102043U (TOYOTA) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JPS60227964 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 6 * abstract * * figure 5 *; | [A]JPH0586971 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 6 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10131725 (KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 6 * abstract * * figure 1; claim 5 *; | [A]DE10036481 (METALLWERKE HARZGERODE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 5 * | by applicant | US4662319 | JPS585455 | GB2349195 | DE10003821 |