EP1960635 - HYBRID OSCILLATING PISTON ENGINE COMPRISING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE PART AND AN ELECTROMOTIVE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hüttlin, Herbert Daimlerstrasse 7 79585 Steinen / DE | [2014/51] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states HÜTTLIN, Herbert Rümminger Strasse 15 79539 Lörrach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Heuckeroth, Volker, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Heuckeroth, Volker, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06829643.3 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP12093 | Priority number, date | DE20051062529 | 16.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005062529 | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007073883 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960635 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1960635 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1960635 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01C9/00, F01C11/00, F01C13/00, F02B53/14 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
F01C9/005 (EP,US);
B60K6/24 (EP,US);
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
B60L50/62 (EP,US);
F01C11/00 (EP,US);
F01C13/00 (EP,US);
F02B53/14 (EP,US);
F02B63/04 (EP,US);
H02K16/00 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (EP,US);
H02K7/1807 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
F02B63/042 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDE SCHWENKKOLBENMASCHINE MIT EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTORTEIL UND EINEM ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN TEIL | [2008/35] | English: | HYBRID OSCILLATING PISTON ENGINE COMPRISING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE PART AND AN ELECTROMOTIVE PART | [2008/35] | French: | MACHINE HYBRIDE A PISTONS ROTATIFS POURVU D'UNE PARTIE MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET D'UNE PARTIE MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2006 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | AT | 15.12.2014 | IE | 15.12.2014 | IT | 15.12.2014 | LU | 15.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | FR | 19.01.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.12.2006 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
AT | 15.12.2014 | ||
IE | 15.12.2014 | ||
IT | 15.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
AT | 15.12.2014 | ||
IE | 15.12.2014 | ||
IT | 15.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.12.2014 | ||
IT | 15.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.12.2014 | ||
IT | 15.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2005224263 (VASILANTONE MICHAEL M [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-10,12,13 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] * [A] 6,7,11; | [YA]RU2237817 ; | [A]US5988307 (YAMADA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,8-10,13 * column 15, line 4 - line 30 * * the whole document *; | [DY]WO03067033 (HUETTLIN HERBERT [DE]) [DY] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2005135950 (HUETTLIN HERBERT [DE]) [Y] 13,14 * figures 1-9 * * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4,5,8,10; | [Y]FR2322282 (ETIENNE CHARLES [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1,2 * * the whole document * | [YA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 28, Database accession no. 2005-270687, XP002425961 & RU2237817 C1 20041010 (ISACHKIN A F) [Y] 14 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1-5,8-10,13 | by applicant | WO03067033 | US2005224263 | RU2237817 | US5988307 | US2005135950 | FR2322282 |