|
17.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2019 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2019 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
33 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
94 |
|
24.08.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
31.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
74 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.04.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
22 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |