24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
13.12.2019 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
03.12.2019 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
03.12.2019 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
07.06.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
01.03.2019 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.02.2019 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.02.2019 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
15.09.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
18.08.2015 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
12.06.2015 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
02.06.2015 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
02.06.2015 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
08.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
08.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.10.2014 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.08.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
11.12.2013 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
12.10.2013 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
05.06.2013 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
24.05.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
19.04.2013 |
Opposition filed |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
08.06.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
05.06.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.06.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.05.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] |
30.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
30.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.08.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
03.03.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.12.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.08.2008 |
First examination report |
|
04.07.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
01.07.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
27.06.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
27.06.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
19.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|