EP1952036 - ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKELMANN, Ludwig Hutstrasse 1a 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
PESCHKE, Harald Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 12 90587 Veitsbronn / DE | 03 /
JAUERNIG, Dieter Glockengasse 21 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2008/32] | Application number, filing date | 06829987.4 | 14.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006EP68427 | Priority number, date | DE20051055037 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005055037 | [2008/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007057384 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952036 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/16, F16C33/78, F16J15/32 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
F16C19/163 (EP,US);
F16C33/726 (EP,US);
F16C33/7853 (EP,US);
F16C33/7859 (EP,US);
F16C33/7886 (EP,US);
F16C33/7896 (EP,US);
F16C35/077 (EP,US);
F16J15/324 (EP,US);
F16J15/3252 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/35] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRÄGKUGELLAGER | [2008/32] | English: | ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING | [2008/32] | French: | ROULEMENT A BILLES A CONTACT OBLIQUE | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 18.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/38] | 24.04.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2118027 (THOMAS BARISH) [A] 8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2065829 (SKF UK LTD) [A] 12,13* the whole document *; | [A]US4428630 (FOLGER RUSSELL F [US], et al) [A] 2,5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3513722 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,3,10 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS62209223 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [A] 2,5-7,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE4209043 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 5-9,11 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 46; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19958788 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 5,6,9,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002186911 (VAN DINE PIETER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [X]JP2003042160 (NSK LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005121164 (NSK LTD) [A] 2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * |