EP1968840 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TRANSPORT OF GOODS BY RAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states Rheinisch-Westfälisch-Technische Hochschule Aachen Templergraben 55 52056 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Rheinisch-Westfälisch-Technische Hochschule Aachen Templergraben 55 52056 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARCH, Stefan Amthausquai 29 CH-4600 Olten / CH | 02 /
HELLINGER, Rolf Meisenstr. 4 91315 Höchstadt / DE | 03 /
MAHR, Winfried Gleisshammer Str. 129c 90480 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
ENNING, Manfred Rosfeld 34 52074 Aachen / DE | 05 /
BAIER, Martin Dahlienweg 1a 82362 Weilheim / DE | 06 /
BERGER, Arne Hesselerstr. 3 52146 Würselen / DE | 07 /
ABEL, Dirk Sandweg 43 52074 Aachen / DE | 08 /
DELLMANN, Torsten Bernhard-Falk-Str. 54 50737 Köln / DE | [2008/38] | Application number, filing date | 06830112.6 | 24.11.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006EP68900 | Priority number, date | DE20061000788 | 04.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006000788 | [2008/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007077060 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1968840 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B61D15/00, B61D49/00 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
B61D15/00 (EP,US);
B61C3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT VON GÜTERN MIT DER EISENBAHN | [2008/38] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TRANSPORT OF GOODS BY RAIL | [2008/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT FERROVIAIRE DE MARCHANDISES | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1455034 (EWERS DIPL ING ENGELBERT) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]DE2908347 (SCHORCH GMBH) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2691422 (ABRF [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * abstract *; | [X]DE4442516 (BEILHACK MASCHF MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [X]EP0718169 (KRAUSS MAFFEI VERKEHRSTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-11,15 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 29; figure - *; | [X]EP1075994 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]WO03020564 (RAIL ROAD NONSTOP LOGISTICS AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,8* abstract * |