EP1964179 - METHODS OF MANUFACTURING REDUCED-RESISTANCE FINFETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/36] | REDUCED-RESISTANCE FINFETS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
[2009/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDELMAN, Jack, Allan 11 Claremont Drive Flat Rock, North Carolina 28731 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Kangguo 35B Hudson View Drive Beacon, New York 12508 / US | 03 /
HSU, Louis, Lu-Chen 7 Crosby Court Fishkill, New York 12524 / US | 04 /
YANG, Haining 36 Robinson Lane Wappingers Falls, New York 12590 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 06830385.8 | 05.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006EP69339 | Priority number, date | US20050316244 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 316244 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007071555 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964179 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964179 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L29/45, H01L21/285, H01L21/8234 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
H01L29/785 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/41791 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/823418 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/823437 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/665 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/6653 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66795 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78618 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2029/7858 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S438/96 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | H01L29/786, H01L21/336, H01L29/45, H01L21/285, H01L21/8234 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FINFETS MIT VERRINGERTEM WIDERSTAND | [2009/19] | English: | METHODS OF MANUFACTURING REDUCED-RESISTANCE FINFETS | [2009/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FINFET À RÉSISTANCE RÉDUITE | [2009/19] |
Former [2008/36] | FINFETS MIT VERRINGERTEM WIDERSTAND UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2008/36] | REDUCED-RESISTANCE FINFETS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
Former [2008/36] | FINFET À RÉSISTANCE RÉDUITE ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 26.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.2009 | BE | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | IT | 02.09.2009 | LT | 02.09.2009 | LV | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | PL | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SE | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | IE | 05.12.2009 | LU | 05.12.2009 | ES | 13.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | IS | 02.01.2010 | PT | 04.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IE | 05.12.2009 | ||
LU | 05.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IE | 05.12.2009 | ||
LU | 05.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IE | 05.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IE | 05.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0017914 (ULTRATECH STEPPER INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 11 - line 13 *; | [A]US6255214 (WIECZOREK KARSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 15 - line 34 *; | [XY]US2004036126 (CHAU ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-12,14,15 * paragraph [0029]; figure 4A * [Y] 13; | [X]US2004099885 (YEO YEE-CHIA [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,9-12,14,15 * paragraph [0062] *; | [A]US2005090067 (JAWARANI DHARMESH [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] *; | [YA]US2005173768 (LEE CHOONG-HO [KR], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] * [A] 8,15; | [A]US2005255643 (AHN YOUNG-JOON [KR], et al) [A] 1,8,9,13,15* paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2005258477 (SAITO TOMOHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,8,9,13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005272235 (WU CHII-MING [TW], et al) [A] 1,8,9,13,15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0022] *; | [A] - RAMOS A R ET AL, "Synthesis of cobalt silicide on porous silicon by high dose ion implantation", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200105), vol. 178, no. 1-4, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 283 - 286, XP004242579 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-583X(00)00481-X | [A] - RAMOS A R ET AL, "Ion beam synthesis of chromium silicide on porous silicon", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200003), vol. 161-163, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 926 - 930, XP004192356 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-583X(99)00812-5 | [A] - LIFSHITZ NADIA, "Dependence of the Work-Function Difference Between the Polysilicon Gate and Silicon Substrate on the Doping Level in Polysilicon", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (198503), vol. ED-32, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 617 - 621, XP002411227 [A] 1,8,9,13,15 * the whole document * |