EP1949015 - HOLSTER FOR A HANDGUN, FOR EXAMPLE, A PISTOL OR A REVOLVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GK Professional 29 Rue Etienne Marey 75020 Paris / FR | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMUCHIAN, Georges 159 Avenue Galliéni F-93177 Bagnolet / FR | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/31] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06831029.1 | 13.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006FR02416 | Priority number, date | FR20050011562 | 15.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0511562 | [2008/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007057529 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1949015 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949015 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F41C33/02 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
F41C33/0263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | 14.05.2008 | BA | 14.05.2008 | HR | 14.05.2008 | MK | 14.05.2008 | RS | 14.05.2008 | Title | German: | HOLSTER FÜR EINE HANDWAFFE, ZUM BEISPIEL EINE PISTOLE ODER EINEN REVOLVER | [2008/31] | English: | HOLSTER FOR A HANDGUN, FOR EXAMPLE, A PISTOL OR A REVOLVER | [2008/31] | French: | ETUI POUR ARME DE POING, COMME PAR EXEMPLE UN PISTOLET OU UN REVOLVER | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2006 | AT | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | IE | 13.11.2012 | LU | 13.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
LU | 13.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 21.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3866811 (HAMBY ROBERT L) [X] 1 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [X]US5284281 (NICHOLS RICHARD E D [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 26; figures 3-12; claims 10,21,22 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 19 * * column 11, line 23 - column 12, line 33 *; | [X]DE10110515 (MUELLER AXEL [DE]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0017] , [0019]; figures 3-7; claim 1 *; | [X]US2003042279 (LOCKLEAR BURNEY [US]) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0016] , [0017] , [0030] , [0035] - [0037] - [0039] , [0040]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2003226866 (HAR-SHEN CHANAN [IL]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2005015114 (MICHAELS OF OREGON CO [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0066]; figures 13,14 *; | [XY]EP1510773 (ARTRADEX S P R L [BE]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0034] , [0041] , [0046] , [0047] , [0049] , [0080] , [0081]; figures 1,2,4-6; claim 1 * [Y] 3,4; | [X]US2005205624 (FRENCH JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009]; figures 1-7; claim 1 *; | [E]WO2006119530 (SPIELBERGER PETER [AT]) [E] 1-4 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 5; figures 1-6; claims 1,3 * * page 5, line 11 - line 14 ** page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 3 * |