EP1964333 - VEHICLE COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADACHI, Akito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
TOMINAGA, Hiroshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
YOKOGAWA, Nobuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
ABE, Toshiyuki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2011/07] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
ADACHI, Akito c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
TOMINAGA, Hiroshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
YOKOGAWA, Nobuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi; Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
ABE, Toshiyuki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06831739.5 | 18.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006IB03657 | Priority number, date | JP20050364844 | 19.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005364844 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007072160 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964333 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964333 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
H04L12/40136 (EP,US);
H04L47/12 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP,US);
H04W28/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2008/36] | English: | VEHICLE COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2008/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION DE VEHICULE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 20.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10157680 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - line 61 * * column 3, line 12 - line 13 * * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 5 * * column 8, line 41 - line 47 * * figure 1 *; | [X] - PUNNOOSE R J ET AL, "Communications resources management for advanced telematics applications", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, 2001. PROCEEDINGS. 2001 IEEE AUGUST 25-29, 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010825), ISBN 0-7803-7194-1, pages 1056 - 1060, XP010555921 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * | [X] - RABEL M ET AL, "INTEGRATING IEEE 1394 AS INFOTAINMENT BACKBONE INTO THE AUTOMOTIVE ENVIRONMENT", VTC 2001 SPRING. IEEE VTS 53RD. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. RHODES, GREECE, MAY 6 - 9, 2001, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010506), VOL. 3 OF 4. CONF. 53, ISBN 0-7803-6728-6, pages 2026 - 2031, XP001082499 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 2 * * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2001.945052 | [A] - BLOKS R H J, "The IEEE-1394 high speed serial bus", PHILIPS JOURNAL OF RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 50, no. 1, ISSN 0165-5817, pages 209 - 216, XP004008212 [A] 1-9 * page 212, line 6 - line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-5817(96)81310-6 | [A] - JENNINGS ROGER, "Fire on the Wire: The IEEE 1394 high performance serial bus", INTERNET CITATION, (19970131), pages 1 - 7, XP002087275 [A] 1-9 * page 5; figure 4 * | by applicant | DE10157680 | JP2004232498 | JP2005022556 |