EP1958459 - DEPTH DEPENDENT FILTERING OF IMAGE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/24] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARENBRUG, Bart, G., B. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/24] |
Former [2008/34] | Uittenbogaard, Frank, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06831955.7 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006IB54456 | Priority number, date | EP20050111632 | 02.12.2005 Original published format: EP 05111632 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007063477 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1958459 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958459 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N13/02, H04N13/04, G06T15/00 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (US);
H04N13/122 (EP);
H04N13/275 (EP,US);
H04N13/279 (EP,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/317 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | H04N13/00, H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIEFENABHÄNGIGE FILTERUNG VON BILDSIGNALEN | [2008/34] | English: | DEPTH DEPENDENT FILTERING OF IMAGE SIGNAL | [2008/34] | French: | FILTRAGE D'UN SIGNAL D'IMAGE DEPENDANT DE LA PROFONDEUR | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2006 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | IT | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | PT | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | IE | 27.11.2018 | LU | 27.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PT | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4925294 (GESHWIND DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 3, lines 17-37; figure 1 * * column 6, lines 18-28 *; | [A]US5751927 (WASON THOMAS D [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 27-33 - column 4, lines 21-24 *; | [A]US2002109701 (DEERING MICHAEL F [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] *; | [A]EP1328129 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0068] - [0091]; figure 9 *; | [A]WO2004039086 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 4, lines 1-17 * * page 5, lines 14,15 * * page 6, lines 7-14 * * page 7, line 30 * * page 9, lines 12-16 * * page 9, lines 19-26 ** page 10, lines 23-32 *; | [A]WO2005027052 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 15 * * page 5, lines 16-33 * * page 7, lines 13-26 * * page 13, lines 13-34; figure 7 * | by applicant | US2003117489 | WO2005027052 |