EP1958149 - STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, METHOD FOR GENERATING 3D IMAGE DATA FROM A 2D IMAGE DATA INPUT AND AN APPARATUS FOR GENERATING 3D IMAGE DATA FROM A 2D IMAGE DATA INPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERNST, Fabian E. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BARENBRUG, Bart G. B. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06831957.3 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006IB54458 | Priority number, date | EP20050111623 | 02.12.2005 Original published format: EP 05111623 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007063478 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1958149 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958149 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
G06T7/571 (EP,US);
G06T15/00 (KR);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEREOBILDANZEIGE, VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON 3D-BILDDATEN AUS EINER 2D-BILDDATENEINGABE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON 3D-BILDDATEN AUS EINER 2D-BILDDATENEINGABE | [2008/34] | English: | STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, METHOD FOR GENERATING 3D IMAGE DATA FROM A 2D IMAGE DATA INPUT AND AN APPARATUS FOR GENERATING 3D IMAGE DATA FROM A 2D IMAGE DATA INPUT | [2008/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES STEREOSCOPIQUES, PROCEDE DE GENERATION DE DONNEES D'IMAGE 3D A PARTIR D'UNE ENTREE DE DONNEES D'IMAGE 2D ET APPAREIL GENERANT DES DONNEES D'IMAGE 3D A PARTIR D'UNE ENTREE D'IMAGE 2D | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2006 | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | IT | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A] - ELDER J H ET AL, "LOCAL SCALE CONTROL FOR EDGE DETECTION AND BLUR ESTIMATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (199807), vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 699 - 716, XP000774198 [A] 1-13 * page 705, column L - page 706, column L; figure 6 * * page 712, column L - column R; figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.689301 | by applicant | EP1021049 |