EP2088790 - Managing the resources of a plurality of base stations by a mobile station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/33] | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION AND BASE STATION | ||
[2014/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUEMITSU, Taisei Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kuniyuki Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
TOMOE, Naohito Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
NAKAZAWA, Masayuki Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
KASHIWAGI, Takashi Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2014/43] |
Former [2009/33] | 01 /
SUEMITSU, Taisei Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Kuniyuki Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
TOMOE, Naohito Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKAZAWA, Masayuki Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
05 /
KASHIWAGI, Takashi Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Popp, Eugen Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/33] | Popp, Eugen MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06832514.1 | 10.11.2006 | [2009/33] | WO2006JP322500 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008056426 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088790 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2088790 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, // H04W72/04, H04W36/18 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/47] | H04W72/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/34] | H04W4/00, H04W16/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/33] | H04Q7/22, H04Q7/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/33] | Title | German: | Verwaltung der Ressourcen mehrerer Basisstationen durch eine Mobilstation | [2014/06] | English: | Managing the resources of a plurality of base stations by a mobile station | [2014/06] | French: | Gestion des ressources d'une pluralité de stations de base par une station mobile | [2014/06] |
Former [2009/33] | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, MOBILSTATION UND BASISSTATION | ||
Former [2009/33] | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION AND BASE STATION | ||
Former [2009/33] | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, STATION MOBILE ET STATION DE BASE | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | Translation filed | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 15.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0076251 (CISCO SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [XI]WO2004015959 (TAIT ELECTRONICS LTD [NZ], et al); | [I]US6978143 (VIALEN JUKKA [FI]) |