EP1973152 - SUBSTRATE CLEANING APPARATUS, METHOD OF SUBSTRATE CLEANING, SUBSTRATE TREATING SYSTEM AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Kazuhisa c/o Tokyo Electron Kyushu Limited 1-1, Fukuhara Koshi-shi Kumamoto 861-1116 / JP | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06832964.8 | 20.11.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006JP323114 | Priority number, date | JP20060002234 | 10.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006002234 | [2008/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007080707 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1973152 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, H01L21/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H01L21/67051 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/02087 (EP,US);
H01L21/67046 (EP,US);
H01L21/6708 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | H01L21/304 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2009/09] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SUBSTRATREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SUBSTRATREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN, SUBSTRATBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2008/39] | English: | SUBSTRATE CLEANING APPARATUS, METHOD OF SUBSTRATE CLEANING, SUBSTRATE TREATING SYSTEM AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2008/39] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DE SUBSTRAT, SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRAT ET SUPPORT D ENREGISTREMENT | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | Translation filed | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 12.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5705223 (BUNKOFSKE RAYMOND JAMES [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 31 *; | [A]WO9940612 (SPEEDFAM CORP [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]US6015467 (NAGASAWA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,13 * abstract *; | [A]US2001037858 (TANIYAMA HIROKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,14 * paragraph [0068]; figures 4,7 *; | [Y]JP2003092278 (SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003309096 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1,11,13* abstract * |