EP1952197 - PROJECTOR SYSTEM HAVING COOLING FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Honmachi 1-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUBURA, Toshiyasu c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R & D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2017/22] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
TSUBURA, Toshiyasu c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R & D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/22] |
Former [2008/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06833314.5 | 17.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006JP323510 | Priority number, date | JP20050336766 | 22.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005336766 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007061079 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952197 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1952197 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, G03B21/16 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
G03B21/16 (EP,KR,US);
G03B21/00 (KR);
H04N9/3141 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | G03B21/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/22] |
Former [2009/04] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROJEKTORSYSTEM MIT KÜHLLÜFTER | [2008/32] | English: | PROJECTOR SYSTEM HAVING COOLING FAN | [2008/32] | French: | SYSTEME PROJECTEUR PRESENTANT UN VENTILATEUR | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |