EP1961542 - INJECTION MOLDING SIMULTANEOUS DECORATION METAL MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHA PRINTING CO., LTD. 3, Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEHARA, Masashi c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO., LTD. 3, Mibu Hanai-cho,Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06834279.9 | 08.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006JP324524 | Priority number, date | JP20050356932 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005356932 | [2008/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066750 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961542 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/14 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B29C45/14016 (EP,US);
B29C33/14 (KR);
B29C45/14 (KR);
B29C45/26 (KR);
B29C45/14065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, HU, SE [2009/02] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | METALLFORM ZUM GLEICHZEITIGEN VERZIEREN DURCH SPRITZGIESSEN | [2008/35] | English: | INJECTION MOLDING SIMULTANEOUS DECORATION METAL MOLD | [2008/35] | French: | MOULE METALLIQUE DE DECORATION SIMULTANEE A MOULAGE PAR INJECTION | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2008 | Translation filed | 04.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 10.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |