EP1964831 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HIGH-PURITY DIPHENYL CARBONATE ON AN INDUSTRIAL SCALE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8440 / JP | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUOKA, Shinsuke 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008440 / JP | 02 /
MIYAJI, Hironori 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008440 / JP | 03 /
HACHIYA, Hiroshi 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008440 / JP | 04 /
MATSUZAKI, Kazuhiko 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008440 / JP | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2009/51] |
Former [2008/36] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06834472.0 | 12.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006JP324717 | Priority number, date | JP20050364511 | 19.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005364511 | [2008/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007072705 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964831 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/06, C07C68/08, C07C69/96, C08G64/04 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
C07C68/065 (EP,US);
C07C68/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07C68/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07C69/96 (KR);
C08G64/04 (KR);
C08G64/307 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/065, C07C69/96 (US,EP);
C07C68/06, C07C69/96 (EP,US);
C07C68/08, C07C69/96 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM DIPHENYLCARBONAT IN INDUSTRIELLEM MASSSTAB | [2008/36] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HIGH-PURITY DIPHENYL CARBONATE ON AN INDUSTRIAL SCALE | [2008/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CARBONATE DE DIPHENYLE DE HAUTE PURETE A UNE ECHELLE INDUSTRIELLE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2008 | Translation filed | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 15.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |