EP1949638 - TRANSMISSION CIRCUIT AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS EMPLOYING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUURA, Toru Panasonic Corp., Intel. Prop. Rights Operat. Comp. IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Kaoru Panasonic Corp., Intel. Prop. Rights Operat. Comp. IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
MATSUURA, Toru Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIDA, Kaoru Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Gassner & Partner Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06834635.2 | 05.12.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006JP324880 | Priority number, date | JP20050358708 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005358708 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007069665 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1949638 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949638 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/36 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
H04L27/361 (EP,US);
H04L27/368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/02] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENDEVORRICHTUNG UND DIESE BENUTZENDE KOMMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/31] | English: | TRANSMISSION CIRCUIT AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS EMPLOYING THE SAME | [2008/31] | French: | CIRCUIT DE TRANSMISSION ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION UTILISANT UN TEL CIRCUIT | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 15.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |