EP1964871 - THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER ELASTOMER, THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER ELASTOMER COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER ELASTOMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUYAMA, Gaku c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-8550 / JP | 02 /
KOKETSU, Shoji c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1, Nada-machi Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi 740-8567 / JP | 03 /
SUSUKI, Kenta c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-8550 / JP | 04 /
KUZE, Katsuaki c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Katata 2-chome, Ohtsu-shi Shiga, 520-0292 / JP | 05 /
UKYO, Shigeo c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Katata 2-chome, Ohtsu-shi Shiga, 520-0292 / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
MARUYAMA, Gaku TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 10-24, Toyo-cho, Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-8550 / JP | ||
02 /
KOKETSU, Shoji TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1, Nada-machiI wakuni-shi Yamaguchi; Yamaguchi 740-8567 / JP | |||
03 /
SUSUKI, Kenta c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 10-24, Toyo-cho, Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-8550 / JP | |||
04 /
KUZE, Katsuaki TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1, Katata 2-Ch ome, Ohtsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | |||
05 /
UKYO, Shigeo TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1, Katata 2-Ch ome, Ohtsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06834758.2 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006JP325015 | Priority number, date | JP20050364775 | 19.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005364775 | JP20060013806 | 23.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006013806 | JP20060013807 | 23.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006013807 | JP20060313804 | 21.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006313804 | [2008/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007072748 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964871 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964871 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/91, C08G63/64 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
C08G63/64 (EP,US);
C08G63/91 (KR);
C08G63/181 (KR);
C08G63/914 (EP,US);
C08G64/40 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | C08G63/91 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYESTERELASTOMER, THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYESTERELASTOMER ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON THERMOPLASTISCHEM POLYESTERELASTOMER | [2008/36] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER ELASTOMER, THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER ELASTOMER COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER ELASTOMER | [2008/36] | French: | ELASTOMERE DE POLYESTER THERMOPLASTIQUE, COMPOSITION D'ELASTOMERE DE POLYESTER THERMOPLASTIQUE, ET PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ELASTOMERE DE POLYESTER THERMOPLASTIQUE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2008 | Translation filed | 26.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 11.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2006 | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | NL | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | IE | 15.12.2013 | LU | 15.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |