EP1964614 - ELECTROSTATIC ATOMIZER AND FOOD PRESERVING CABINET WITH ELECTROSTATIC ATOMIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUDA, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
NAKADA, Takayuki c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
MACHI, Masaharu c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
SUDA, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKADA, Takayuki c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
MACHI, Masaharu c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
SUDA, Hiroshi c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Ka doma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKADA, Takayuki c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Ka doma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
MACHI, Masaharu c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Ka doma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06834960.4 | 19.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006JP325250 | Priority number, date | JP20050371055 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005371055 | [2008/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007072811 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964614 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964614 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/025, B05B5/16 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B05B5/0255 (EP,US);
A23B7/158 (EP,US);
A23L3/3589 (EP,US);
A61L2/22 (EP,US);
A61L9/14 (EP,US);
B05B15/40 (EP,US);
B05B5/035 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHER ZERSTÄUBER UND SCHRANK ZUM AUFBEWAHREN VON LEBENSMITTELN MIT ELEKTROSTATISCHEM ZERSTÄUBER | [2008/36] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC ATOMIZER AND FOOD PRESERVING CABINET WITH ELECTROSTATIC ATOMIZER | [2008/36] | French: | ATOMISEUR ELECTROSTATIQUE ET CHAMBRE DE CONSERVATION D' ALIMENTS A ATOMISEUR ELECTROSTATIQUE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2008 | Translation filed | 28.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 29.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.04.2011 | 12.04.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2006 | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6679441 (BORRA JEAN-PASCAL [FR], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 9, line 16; figure 1 *; | [X]JP2005164139 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6397838 (ZIMLICH JR WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004078244 (VENTAIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - CLOUPEAU M ET AL, "ELECTROSTATIC SPRAYING OF LIQUIDS IN CONE-JET MODE", JOURNAL OF ELECTROSTATICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890701), vol. 22, no. 2, ISSN 0304-3886, pages 135 - 159, XP000039067 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3886(89)90081-8 |