EP1970412 - POLYARYLENE SULFIDE RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 18-1, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8280 / JP | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-0021 / JP | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDOH, Hidemi Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 4168533 / JP | 02 /
FUKASAWA, Yoshihito Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 4168533 / JP | 03 /
MONDE, Hiroyuki Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd. Tokushima ResearchLaboratories 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 7710193 / JP | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2014/32] |
Former [2013/37] | Broughton, Jon Philip, et al Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4BW / GB | ||
Former [2012/23] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell LLP Barnes 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Peel, James Peter Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06834979.4 | 13.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006JP325309 | Priority number, date | JP20050362684 | 16.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005362684 | [2008/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007069770 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970412 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02, C08K3/22, C08K3/24 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08L81/02 (KR);
C08K3/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08K7/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L81/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/24, C08L81/02 (US,EP);
C08K7/00, C08L81/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | POLYARYLENSULFIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/38] | English: | POLYARYLENE SULFIDE RESIN COMPOSITION | [2008/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE DE SULFURE DE POLYARYLENE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | Translation filed | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9720324 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 12 * * page 8, line 4 * * claims 4-6,8 *; | [A]WO9742639 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 2 * |