Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1968944 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1968944



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(53)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 327
24.02.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.02.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
23.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
23.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.10.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.10.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.10.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
21.10.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 12
21.10.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 12
15.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.06.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
15.06.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
15.06.2012 Description Search / examination 6
15.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.06.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.04.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.03.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.12.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
08.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
08.12.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.07.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
05.07.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
05.07.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 25
05.07.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
05.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.12.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 5
10.12.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
04.09.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
01.09.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
01.09.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.09.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.08.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.08.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
02.07.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 11
27.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
27.06.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
25.04.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.07.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
11.07.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
21.06.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
21.06.2007 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 40