EP1960016 - METHOD FOR EXTRACORPOREAL REMOVAL OF A PATHOGENIC MICROBE, AN INFLAMMATORY CELL OR AN INFLAMMATORY PROTEIN FROM BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExThera Medical Corporation 757 Arnold Drive, Suite B Martinez, CA 94553 / US | [2016/47] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states ExThera Medical Corporation 813 Heinz Avenue Berkeley CA 94710 / US | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states ExThera Medical LLC 813 Heinz Avenue Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | ||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Exthera AB Tomtebodavägen 21A 171 77 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARM, Olle Tranebergsstrand 11 S-167 40 Bromma / SE | 02 /
BERGSTRÖM, Thomas Ellösgatan 4 S-416 74 Göteborg / SE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2012/04] | Kånge, Lars Rikard, et al Awapatent AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Mattsson, Niklas Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06835845.6 | 13.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006SE01421 | Priority number, date | SE20050002750 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: SE 0502750 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007069983 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960016 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1960016 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/34, A61K31/70, A61M1/36 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
A61M1/3679 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A61M2202/0413 (US);
A61M2202/203 (US);
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | A61M1/34, A61K31/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKORPORALEN ENTFERNUNG EINER PATHOGENEN MIKROBE, ENTZÜNDUNGSZELLE ODER EINES ENTZÜNDUNGSPROTEINS AUS BLUT | [2008/35] | English: | METHOD FOR EXTRACORPOREAL REMOVAL OF A PATHOGENIC MICROBE, AN INFLAMMATORY CELL OR AN INFLAMMATORY PROTEIN FROM BLOOD | [2008/35] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR ÉLIMINATION EXTRACORPORELLE D'UN MICROBE PATHOGÈNE, D UNE CELLULE INFLAMMATOIRE OU D UNE PROTÉINE INFLAMMATOIRE DU SANG | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | LU | 13.12.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/49] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 05.10.2016 | |
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5437861 (OKARMA THOMAS B [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,10,15,16 * column 7, lines 30-44 *; | [X]US6197568 (MARKS RORY M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-11,16 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 6 * * column 7, lines 9-44 * * column 12, lines 1-32 ** example 5 *; | [X]US2002197252 (BRADY JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10,15,16 * paragraph [0143] * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5447859 (PRUSSAK CHARLES E [US]); | [A]EP1044696 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]); | [X]US6197568 (MARKS RORY M [US], et al); | [X] - FUJITA M. ET AL., "Adsorption of Inflammatory Cytokines Using a Heparin-Coated Extracorporeal Circuit", ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, (2002), vol. 26, no. 12, pages 1020 - 1025, XP003009942 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1525-1594.2002.07017.x | [A] - HIRMO S. ET AL., "Sialylgylcoconjugate- and proteoglycan-binding microbial lectins", INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, UNIVERSITY OF LUND, XP003009943 | [A] - WIER D.M., "Carbohydrates as recognition molecules in infection and immunity", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 47, pages 331 - 340, XP003009944 |