EP1962647 - SYSTEM AND FIXING DEVICE FOR FIXING SHELF ACCESSORIES TO A SHELF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HL DISPLAY AB P.O. Box 1118 131 26 Nacka Strand / SE | [2014/32] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states HL DISPLAY AB Horisontvägen 26 128 34 Skarpnäck / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJÖBERG, Mårten Frödingsvägen 14 112 56 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
JOSEFSSON, Börje Hoppvägen 3 860 30 Sörberge / SE | [2016/44] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
SJÖBERG, Mårten Frödingsvägen 14 S-112 56 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
JOSEFSSON, Börje Hoppvägen 3 S-860 30 Sörberge / SE | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2013/47] |
Former [2008/36] | Wennborg, Johan, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06835875.3 | 20.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006SE01457 | Priority number, date | SE20050002868 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: SE 0502868 | [2008/36] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007073295 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | SV | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1962647 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1962647 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/00, A47B57/58 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
A47B96/02 (EP);
A47F5/0043 (EP);
A47F5/005 (EP);
A47F5/0068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON REGALZUBEHÖR AN EINEM REGAL | [2008/36] | English: | SYSTEM AND FIXING DEVICE FOR FIXING SHELF ACCESSORIES TO A SHELF | [2008/36] | French: | SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION PERMETTANT DE FIXER DES ACCESSOIRES D'ÉTAGÈRE SUR UNE ÉTAGÈRE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2006 | Translation filed | 26.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2006 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | IE | 20.12.2017 | LU | 20.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.12.2006 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.12.2006 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0197660 (HL DISPLAY AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004112549 (HL DISPLAY AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4762236 (JACKLE III WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [X]US6299004 (THALENFELD DAVID R [US], et al) |