EP1977534 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING COMBINER LOSS IN A MULTI-SECTOR, OMNI-BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKÄRBY, Ulf Roburvägen 20 S-181 33 Lidingö / SE | 02 /
STAUDTE, Donald Frimansväg 14 S-14160 Huddinge / SE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06835929.8 | 01.12.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006SE50533 | Priority number, date | US20060761782P | 25.01.2006 Original published format: US 761782 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007086785 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977534 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H01Q1/24, H04W16/24, H04W88/08 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
H04B7/0491 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | H04B7/04, H04Q7/30, H01Q1/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON KOMBINIERERVERLUSTEN IN EINER MEHRSEKTOR-OMNI-BASIS-STATION | [2008/41] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING COMBINER LOSS IN A MULTI-SECTOR, OMNI-BASE STATION | [2008/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉDUIRE LA PERTE DE SIGNAL D'UN MULTIPLEXEUR DANS UNE STATION DE BASE OMNIDIRECTIONNELLE À MULTIPLES SECTEURS | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/13] | 17.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4715048 (MASAMURA TATSURO [JP]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * column 2, lines 41-43, 56-68 * * column 3, lines 1-5 * * column 5, lines 61-66 * * column 6, lines 1-13 ** column 7, lines 25-26, 30-33, 57-60 *; | [X]EP1026834 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 26] , [0 37] - [0041] - [0 45] , [0 47] - [0048] - [0 75] - [0082] - [0 90] , [ 119] - [0120] * | International search | [X]US2005215288 (BEAUDIN STEVE [CA], et al); | [X]WO2005088764 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [X]WO9926317 (RADIO DESIGN INNOVATION TJ AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2005125045 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | Examination | US5859842 | by applicant | EP1026834 | US2005215288 |