EP1927214 - CRYPTOGRAPHICALLY SECURE PSEUDO-RANDOM NUMBER GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Gregory Gordon 3234 North Star Drive San Diego, California 92117 / US | 02 /
GANTMAN, Alexander 13242 Edina Way Poway, California 92064 / US | 03 /
XIAO, Lu c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2008/24] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
ROSE, Gregory Gordon 3234 North Star Drive San Diego, California 92117 / US | ||
02 /
GANTMAN, Alexander 13242 Edina Way Poway, California 92064 / US | |||
03 /
XIAO, Lu 8730 Costa Verde Blvd 2203 San Diego, California 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06836108.8 | 24.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006US33270 | Priority number, date | US20050711148P | 24.08.2005 Original published format: US 711148 P | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037869 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927214 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/22 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
G06F7/588 (EP,US);
H04L9/0662 (EP,KR,US);
G06F7/58 (EP,US);
H04L9/0656 (KR);
H04L2209/043 (EP,US);
H04L2209/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Title | German: | KRYPTOGRAPHISCHER, SICHERER PSEUDO-ZUFALLSZAHLENGENERATOR | [2008/23] | English: | CRYPTOGRAPHICALLY SECURE PSEUDO-RANDOM NUMBER GENERATOR | [2008/23] | French: | GENERATEUR DE NOMBRES PSEUDOALEATOIRES A SECURITE CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5778069 (THOMLINSON MATTHEW W [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 11 * * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 60 *; | [X]US6628786 (DOLE BRYN [US]) [X] 1-36 * abstract * * column 5, line 41 - column 7, line 12 *; | [A]US2004071289 (ROSE GREGORY GORDON [AU], et al) [A] 1-36 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0081] *; | [A] - STEVE BABBAGE, CHRISTOPHE DE CANNIERE, JOSEF LANO, BART PRENEEL, JOOS VANDEWALLE, Cryptanalysis of SOBER-t32, SPRINGER BERLIN /HEIDELBERG, (2003), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-540-20449-7, XP002413853 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * |