EP2074305 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE SYSTEM COMPRISING A TRANSLATING CORE COWL AND OPERATIONAL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/27] | TRANSLATING CORE COWL FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | ||
[2012/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFER, Bradley C. 10 Lyons Street Ellington, CT 06029 / US | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06836279.7 | 12.10.2006 | [2009/27] | WO2006US39935 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008045061 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074305 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2074305 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/09, F02K3/06, F02K1/15 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
F02K1/09 (EP,US);
F02K1/15 (EP,US);
F02K3/06 (EP,US);
F05D2240/1281 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/27] | Title | German: | GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK MIT EINER HAUBE MIT TRANSLATORISCH VERSCHIEBBAREM KERN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2012/07] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE SYSTEM COMPRISING A TRANSLATING CORE COWL AND OPERATIONAL METHOD THEREOF | [2012/07] | French: | TURBINE À GAZ AVEC UN CAPOT CENTRAL MOBILE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CELLE-CI. | [2012/07] |
Former [2009/27] | HAUBE FÜR EIN GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK MIT TRANSLATORISCH VERSCHIEBBAREM KERN | ||
Former [2009/27] | TRANSLATING CORE COWL FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | ||
Former [2009/27] | CAPOT CENTRAL MOBILE POUR UNE TURBINE À GAZ | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3897001 (HELMINTOLLER JR AUGUSTUS MASON, et al) [X] 1-20 * column 3, line 19 - line 52 * * column 4, line 1 - line 29 * * column 4, line 56 - line 60 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2198999 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 35 - line 37 * * page 3, line 7 - line 14 * * page 6, line 14 - line 35 ** figures 4,6 * | by applicant | US3897001 | GB2188999 |