EP1940755 - METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING COMPOUNDS OF INTEREST USING ENCODED LIBRARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Praecis Pharmaceuticals Inc. 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN, Barry 237 Prospect Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 02 /
HALE, Stephen 133 Brookside Avenue Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 03 /
ARICO-MUENDEL, Christopher, C. 21 Shaw Street West Roxbury, MA 02132 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Matthew 4 Glenn Terrace Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
WAGNER, Richard 24 Coolidge Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 06 /
ISRAEL, David, I. 117 Anson Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 07 /
GEFTER, Malcolm, L. 46 Baker Bridge Road Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | 08 /
KAVARANA, Malcolm, J. 516 Farms Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 09 /
CREASER, Steffen, Phillip 47 Cottage Street, 3 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 10 /
FRANKLIN, George, J. Praecis Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02541 / US | 11 /
CENTRELLA, Paulo, A. 612 Old Stonebrook Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 12 /
ACHARYA, Raksha, A. 2 Glen Ora Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 13 /
BENJAMIN, Dennis 18109 Ne 101st Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 14 /
HANSEN, Nils Jakob, Vest Gammel Kongevej 23, 3 DK-1610 Copenhagen V / DK | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
MORGAN, Barry 237 Prospect Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | ||
02 /
HALE, Stephen 133 Brookside Avenue Belmont, MA 02478 / US | |||
03 /
ARICO-MUENDEL, Christopher, C. 21 Shaw Street West Roxbury, MA 02132 / US | |||
04 /
CLARK, Matthew 4 Glenn Terrace Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
05 /
WAGNER, Richard 24 Coolidge Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
06 /
ISRAEL, David, I. 117 Anson Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | |||
07 /
GEFTER, Malcolm, L. 46 Baker Bridge Road Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | |||
08 /
KAVARANA, Malcolm, J. 516 Farms Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | |||
09 /
CREASER, Steffen, Phillip 47 Cottage Street, 3 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
10 /
FRANKLIN, George, J. 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02541 / US | |||
11 /
CENTRELLA, Paulo, A. 612 Old Stonebrook Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
12 /
ACHARYA, Raksha, A. 2 Glen Ora Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
13 /
BENJAMIN, Dennis 18109 Ne 101st Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
14 /
HANSEN, Nils Jakob, Vest Gammel Kongevej 23, 3 DK-1610 Copenhagen V / DK | |||
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
MORGAN, Barry 237 Prospect Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | ||
02 /
HALE, Stephen 133 Brookside Avenue Belmont, MA 02478 / US | |||
03 /
ARICO-MUENDEL, Christopher, C. 21 Shaw Street West Roxbury, MA 02132 / US | |||
04 /
CLARK, Matthew 4 Glenn Terrace Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
05 /
WAGNER, Richard 24 Coolidge Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
06 /
ISRAEL, David, I. 117 Anson Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | |||
07 /
GEFTER, Malcolm, L. 46 Baker Bridge Road Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | |||
08 /
KAVARANA, Malcolm, J. 516 Farms Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | |||
09 /
CREASER, Steffen, Phillip 47 Cottage Street, 3 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
10 /
FRANKLIN, George, J. 18 Murray Avenue Auburn, MA 01501 / US | |||
11 /
CENTRELLA, Paulo, A. 612 Old Stonebrook Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
12 /
ACHARYA, Raksha, A. 2 Glen Ora Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
13 /
BENJAMIN, Dennis 18109 Ne 101st Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
14 /
HANSEN, Nils Jakob, Vest Gammel Kongevej 23, 3 DK-1610 Copenhagen V / DK | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Lock, Graham James Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06836472.8 | 23.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US41356 | Priority number, date | US20050731464P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 731464 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007053358 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940755 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07B61/00, C12N15/10 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/1068 (EP,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | 21.04.2008 | BA | 21.04.2008 | HR | 21.04.2008 | MK | 21.04.2008 | RS | 21.04.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON VERBINDUNGEN VON INTERESSE MITHILFE KODIERTER BIBLIOTHEKEN | [2008/28] | English: | METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING COMPOUNDS OF INTEREST USING ENCODED LIBRARIES | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDES D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSES ETUDIES, PAR RECOURS A DES BIBLIOTHEQUES CODEES | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/25] | Divisional application(s) | EP11000276.3 / EP2368868 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004056994 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-47 * page 5 - page 6 * * page 11 - page 12 * * page 17 * * page 56, paragraph 2 * * figures 6-20 ** claims 1,15,60,70,78 *; | [X]WO2004083427 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-47 * page 3, paragraphs 5,6 * * page 21, paragraph 2 * * page 55 - page 56 * * figures 1,8-12 *; | [X]WO2005058479 (PRAECIS PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-47 * pages 2-3 * * page 5, paragraph L * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * examples 1-3,10 * * claims 1,2,87,98,101,105 *; | [X]US2005158765 (MORGAN BARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-47 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0012] , [0030] * * examples 1-3,10 * * claims 1,2,37,41,44,105 *; | [X]WO2005090566 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-47 * page 3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 35, paragraph L * * claim 89 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4293652 | US4356270 | US4416988 | US4458066 | US4683192 | US4683202 | US4800159 | US4965188 | WO9118980 | WO9119818 | WO9218619 | WO9306121 | US5223409 | WO9320242 | US5270163 | WO9413623 | US5360928 | US5503978 | US5567588 | US5573905 | US5580726 | WO9638579 | US5654151 | US5674743 | US5700644 | US5708153 | US5723598 | WO9813523 | WO9927133 | US5989892 | WO0023458 | US6060596 | US6210891 | WO0123610 | US6258568 | US6274320 | US2001024790 | WO02074929 | WO02103008 | WO03101972 | WO2004069849 | US6787308 | WO2005003375 | US6902921 | WO2005054431 | WO2005058479 | US2005158765 | WO2005073410 | WO2005080605 | - HOLT, L.J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, no. 15, page E72 | - BRENNER; LERNER, PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 5381 - 5383 | - NIELSEN; JANDA, METHODS. A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1994), vol. 6, pages 361 - 371 | - NIELSEN; BRENNER; JANDA, J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, pages 9812 - 9813 | - NARANG ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 68, page 90 | - BROWN, METH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 68, page 109 | - SANGER, F. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. US.A., (1977), vol. 75, pages 5463 - 5467 | - MAXAM; GILBERT, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1977), vol. 74, pages 560 - 564 | - RONAGHI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, page 363,365 | - LYSOV ET AL., DOKL AKAD NAUK SSSR, (1988), vol. 303, pages 1508 - I511 | - BAINS; SMITH, J THEORBIOL, (1988), vol. 135, pages 303 - 307 | - DRNANAC, R. ET AL., GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 114 - 128 | - KHRAPKO ET AL., FEBS LETT, (1989), vol. 256, pages 118 - 122 | - PEVZNER, JBIOMOL STRUCT DYN, (1989), vol. 7, pages 63 - 73 | - SOUTHERN, GENOMICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 1008 - 1017 | - BAUER, J., J. CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (1999), vol. 722, pages 55 - 69 | - BRODY ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS LETT., (1999), vol. 74, pages 144 - 146 | - LYSOV ET AL., DOKL AKAD NAUK SSSR, (1988), vol. 303, pages 1508 - 1511 | - PEVZNER, J BIOMOL STRUCT DYN, (1989), vol. 7, pages 63 - 73 | - SOUTHERN ET AL., GENOMICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 1008 - 1017 | - RONAGHI ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 242, pages 84 - 89 | - RONAGHI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, pages 363 - 365 | - REEVES ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1969), vol. 28, pages 282 - 287 | - GUILLORY ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1971), vol. 39, pages 170 - 180 | - JOHNSON ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1968), vol. 15, page 273 | - COOK ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1978), vol. 91, pages 557 - 565 | - DRAKE ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1979), vol. 94, pages 117 - 120 | - SELVIN, METHODS IN ENZYNZ., (1995), vol. 246, page 300 | - DAUGHERTY, P.S. ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1999), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 613 - 621 | - ILOLT, L.J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RE.S., (2000), vol. 28, no. 15, page E72 | - SHAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, pages 399 - 401 |