Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050549 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941225 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58491106 | 23.10.2006 | WO2006US41374 | 24.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941165 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2013 | B1 | EP1941165 | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58491106 | 23.10.2006 | WO2006US41375 | 24.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201013434Y | 30.01.2008 | Y | Priority number | Date | US58491106 | 23.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201059218Y | 14.05.2008 | Y | Priority number | Date | US58491206 | 23.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1941165T | 31.10.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US58491106 | 23.10.2006 | WO2006US41375 | 24.10.2006 | EP06836477 | 24.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050550 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58491106 | 23.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007095504 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58491206 | 23.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007089874 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58491106 | 23.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2008120615 | 10.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58491106 | 23.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2434193 | 20.11.2011 | C2 | RU2008120616 | 10.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58491206 | 23.10.2006 | US72974005 | 24.10.2005 |