EP1945992 - PROCESS FOR ADHERING A LINER TO THE SURFACE OF A PIPE BY INDUCTION HEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | For all designated states Crane-Resistoflex One Quality Way Marion, NC 28752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states Crane-Resistoflex One Quality Way Marion, NC 28752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARNSWORTH, Kimberly, Dawn Route 1, Box 241-0 Walker, West Virginia 26180 / US | 02 /
MCKEEN, Laurence, Waino 7 Crater Court Sewell, New Jersey 08080-2401 / US | 03 /
HOFFMAN, William, Isaac 170 Sweetwater Hills Hendersonville, North Carolina 28791 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/30] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06836513.9 | 25.10.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US41587 | Priority number, date | US20050730263P | 26.10.2005 Original published format: US 730263 P | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007050664 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1945992 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L58/10, F16L55/165 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
F16L55/1652 (EP,US);
B29C63/34 (EP,US);
C09J5/06 (EP,US);
F16L55/165 (EP,US);
F16L55/1656 (EP,US);
F16L58/1036 (EP,US);
C09J2427/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/47] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANBRINGUNG EINER VERKLEIDUNG AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE EINES ROHRES DURCH INDUKTIONSERHITZUNG | [2008/30] | English: | PROCESS FOR ADHERING A LINER TO THE SURFACE OF A PIPE BY INDUCTION HEATING | [2008/30] | French: | PROCESSUS DE COLLAGE D'UN REVETEMENT A LA SURFACE D'UN TUYAU PAR CHAUFFAGE A INDUCTION | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 27.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.12.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US2005241712 (BLACKMORE RICHARD [US], et al) [XP] 1-6,9-17,19-22 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0028] , [0043]; figure 3; claim 8 *; | [X]EP0278466 (INSITUFORM INT INC [LR], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 50-59 *; | [A]US5762741 (KODOKIAN GEORGE KEVORK [US]) [A] 1-22 * figure 4 *; | [APD]WO2005100843 (DU PONT [US], et al) [APD] 1-22 * abstract * |