Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006138625 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2007 | A3 | WO2006138625 | 28.12.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006138556 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A3 | WO2006138556 | 28.12.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006099546 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9125078 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2015 | B2 | US2014022946 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9148208 | 03.10.2008 | WO2006US42302 | 27.10.2006 | US201314033322 | 20.09.2013 | US201113082136 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013010755 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US201213542354 | 05.07.2012 | US52915910 | 03.03.2010 | WO2006US41981 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8599712 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2013 | B2 | US2011280183 | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9148208 | 03.10.2008 | WO2006US42302 | 27.10.2006 | US201113082136 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011173464 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9144906 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42082 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8457092 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2013 | B2 | US2010215030 | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77509710 | 06.05.2010 | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US45507106 | 15.06.2006 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010150106 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US52915910 | 03.03.2010 | WO2006US41981 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8457042 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2013 | B2 | US2010110976 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9146106 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41937 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8761080 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2014 | B2 | US2010069107 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37677206 | 15.03.2006 | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US62184309 | 19.11.2009 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8238289 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2012 | B2 | US2010046423 | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9144106 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42025 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8089893 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2012 | B2 | US2010034101 | 11.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41731 | 27.10.2006 | US9145806 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009316632 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42311 | 27.10.2006 | US9145106 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009305664 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41945 | 27.10.2006 | US9151106 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009303890 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41870 | 27.10.2006 | US9151806 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8078135 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2011 | B2 | US2009245121 | 01.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42412 | 27.10.2006 | US9146806 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009222698 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9159806 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42084 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009221305 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9166006 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42079 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009219917 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41963 | 27.10.2006 | US9147006 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8411621 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2013 | B2 | US2009219887 | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41908 | 27.10.2006 | US9147706 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8923211 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2014 | B2 | US2009219867 | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9150706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41933 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009219866 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42255 | 27.10.2006 | US9143406 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8675549 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2014 | B2 | US2009219857 | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42226 | 27.10.2006 | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9147906 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009219845 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42012 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US9163006 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8199661 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2012 | B2 | US2009219840 | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41982 | 27.10.2006 | US9150006 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009213791 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42325 | 27.10.2006 | US9159406 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8218479 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2012 | B2 | US2009213790 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9147606 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41869 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009213789 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41921 | 27.10.2006 | US9147406 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009213788 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41785 | 27.10.2006 | US9145606 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009207830 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42310 | 27.10.2006 | US9146706 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009207790 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41919 | 27.10.2006 | US9146406 | 26.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009207744 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41776 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US9144706 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009201833 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9151606 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42322 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009180424 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9148406 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42067 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8014749 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2011 | B2 | US2009175297 | 09.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9152306 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42011 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8331285 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2012 | B2 | US2009175217 | 09.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41971 | 27.10.2006 | US9151306 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009164658 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42010 | 27.10.2006 | US9165106 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8326330 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2012 | B2 | US2009164609 | 25.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42028 | 27.10.2006 | US9147106 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8477808 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2013 | B2 | US2009161775 | 25.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41942 | 27.10.2006 | US9152106 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009156207 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42488 | 27.10.2006 | US9151006 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7852793 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2010 | B2 | US2009154578 | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41873 | 27.10.2006 | US9145706 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009149172 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9145506 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42419 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8027302 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2011 | B2 | US2009147802 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42112 | 27.10.2006 | US9144506 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8971222 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2015 | B2 | US2009147739 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42493 | 27.10.2006 | US9147506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8248950 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2012 | B2 | US2009147730 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9148506 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41961 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8289897 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2009147729 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9147206 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42083 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009147713 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41777 | 27.10.2006 | US9146506 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8265066 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2012 | B2 | US2009147712 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41900 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US9143506 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7924800 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2011 | B2 | US2009147694 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9148206 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42302 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8520628 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2013 | B2 | US2009147693 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41931 | 27.10.2006 | US9148006 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8000407 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2011 | B2 | US2009135927 | 28.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42013 | 27.10.2006 | US9145206 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8289908 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2009135768 | 28.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9150206 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42032 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009129325 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9158606 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42418 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8744444 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2009098841 | 16.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42599 | 27.10.2006 | US9145306 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8184574 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2012 | B2 | US2009097437 | 16.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42113 | 27.10.2006 | US9146306 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7855976 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2010 | B2 | US2009097410 | 16.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US9148306 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42023 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009086758 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41998 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US9143606 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8107421 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2012 | B2 | US2009086665 | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9145006 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42260 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009067547 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42414 | 27.10.2006 | US9146006 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7933219 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2011 | B2 | US2009052340 | 26.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41910 | 27.10.2006 | US9147306 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009046699 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9140706 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41946 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009046640 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9151706 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41914 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009034445 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42108 | 27.10.2006 | US9157606 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008311908 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42313 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US9145906 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008310357 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41929 | 27.10.2006 | US9146906 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008293421 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41943 | 27.10.2006 | US9144806 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007147226 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007097935 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US36946606 | 07.03.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9055552 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2015 | B2 | US2007015523 | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US45447406 | 15.06.2006 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8750908 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2014 | B2 | US2006285485 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US45507106 | 15.06.2006 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7742444 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2010 | B2 | US2006234752 | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37677206 | 15.03.2006 | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101242269B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | B1 | KR20080064183 | 08.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42322 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101088934B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2011 | B1 | KR20100028658 | 12.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101061755B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2011 | B1 | KR20080070032 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41931 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101061749B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2011 | B1 | KR20100092529 | 20.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42255 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101024726B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2011 | B1 | KR20080070707 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100976009B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2010 | B1 | KR20080025149 | 19.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100962454B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2010 | B1 | KR20080028431 | 31.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100946099B | Global Dossier | 10.03.2010 | B1 | KR20070120162 | 21.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100933654B | Global Dossier | 23.12.2009 | B1 | KR20080070022 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41919 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6208172B | Global Dossier | 04.10.2017 | B2 | JP2015213325 | 26.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015046901 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5911900B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | B2 | JP2014161013 | 04.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012151854 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5539278B | Global Dossier | 02.07.2014 | B2 | JP2012010351 | 12.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5248649B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011182439 | 15.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5290336B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2013 | B2 | JP2011151818 | 04.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4814331B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009522829 | 11.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41869 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009520385 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60337 | 27.10.2006 | US36946606 | 07.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009516940 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41971 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4819909B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514432 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42599 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4964246B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2012 | B2 | JP2009514430 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42493 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514429 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42488 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514428 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42419 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514427 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42418 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514426 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42414 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514425 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42412 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514423 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42325 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5318577B | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B2 | JP2009514421 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42322 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4779021B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2011 | B2 | JP2009514420 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42313 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4834105B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2011 | B2 | JP2009514419 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42311 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514418 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42310 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4865802B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2012 | B2 | JP2009514417 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42302 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514415 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42260 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514414 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42255 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514413 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42226 | 27.10.2006 | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4814335B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514412 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42113 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4691599B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | B2 | JP2009514411 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42112 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514410 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42108 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514408 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42084 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4819908B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514407 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42083 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514406 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42082 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514405 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42079 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514404 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42067 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514397 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | WO2006US42055 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4814333B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514395 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42032 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4777434B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2011 | B2 | JP2009514394 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42028 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4691598B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | B2 | JP2009514393 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42025 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514392 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42023 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514391 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42013 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4824764B | Global Dossier | 30.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514390 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42012 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514389 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42011 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514388 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42010 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514387 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41998 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4814332B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514386 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41982 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514385 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41963 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5221366B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2013 | B2 | JP2009514384 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41961 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514381 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41946 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514380 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41945 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4824763B | Global Dossier | 30.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514379 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41943 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4700108B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2011 | B2 | JP2009514378 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41942 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514377 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41937 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514376 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41933 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4906866B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2012 | B2 | JP2009514375 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41931 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514374 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41929 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514372 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41921 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514371 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41919 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514370 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41914 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4691597B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | B2 | JP2009514369 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41910 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4805355B | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | B2 | JP2009514368 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41908 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4896983B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2012 | B2 | JP2009514367 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41900 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514366 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41873 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514365 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41870 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514364 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41785 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514363 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41777 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009514362 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41776 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4691596B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | B2 | JP2009514360 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41731 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008547287 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4746096B | Global Dossier | 10.08.2011 | B2 | JP2008547277 | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4673403B | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | B2 | JP2008533922 | 21.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2592804 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B1 | EP2592804 | 15.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06836587 | 27.10.2006 | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | WO2006US42055 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2362569 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | EP06826883 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2362568 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | EP06827064 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2205034 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2010 | A3 | EP2205034 | 07.07.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | EP06826837 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2175685 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2010 | A3 | EP2175685 | 14.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06826915 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1972165 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42255 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949747 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42025 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949745 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41873 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949744 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41870 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949743 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41869 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949742 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41776 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949740 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42488 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949739 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42419 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949738 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42325 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949737 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42322 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949736 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42313 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949735 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42311 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949734 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42260 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949733 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42226 | 27.10.2006 | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949732 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42113 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949731 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42112 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949730 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42084 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949729 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2010 | B1 | EP1949729 | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42067 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949728 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41943 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949727 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41931 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949726 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41914 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949725 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41777 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949723 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41961 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949722 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41921 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949712 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42493 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949618 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41933 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949608 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2017 | B1 | EP1949608 | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42599 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949607 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42082 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949606 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41998 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949605 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41910 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949604 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41900 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949582 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42023 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949204 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42108 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946598 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2011 | B1 | EP1946598 | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42079 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946595 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42414 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946594 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2011 | B1 | EP1946594 | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42028 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946593 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2010 | B1 | EP1946593 | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41942 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946592 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41937 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946591 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41929 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946590 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41731 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946587 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42012 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946586 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42010 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946585 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41919 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946511 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42412 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946500 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B1 | EP1946500 | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41785 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946494 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42310 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946493 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42083 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946491 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42013 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946490 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42011 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946489 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41946 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946456 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41963 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941776 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60337 | 27.10.2006 | US36946605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941767 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41945 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941691 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B1 | EP1941691 | 09.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | WO2006US42055 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941681 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42032 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941680 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41908 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941666 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41982 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941665 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41971 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941642 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42302 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1894427 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2017 | B1 | EP1894427 | 03.08.2011 | A4 | EP1894427 | 05.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891831 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1867068 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2018 | B1 | EP1867068 | 19.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006261620B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2010 | B2 | AU2006261620 | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006259301 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006222891C | Global Dossier | 02.09.2010 | C1 | AU2006222891B | 18.02.2010 | B2 | AU2006222891 | 21.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1952661 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42418 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR052702 | 28.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR054137 | 06.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR056601 | 10.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36946606 | 07.03.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR056604 | 10.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR079056 | 21.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE449516T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41785 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE467997T | 15.05.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42067 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE470282T | 15.06.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41942 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE508605T | 15.05.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42079 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE520273T | 15.08.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42028 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0609036 | 12.01.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0611791 | 28.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0612090 | 07.05.2019 | B1 | BRPI0612090 | 19.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0617870 | 29.10.2019 | B1 | BRPI0617870 | 09.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | WO2006US42055 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2601867 | 27.11.2012 | C | CA2601867 | 21.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2612251 | 03.09.2013 | C | CA2612251 | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2612366 | 26.06.2012 | C | CA2612366 | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2626807 | 11.08.2015 | C | CA2626807 | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | WO2006US42055 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2724736 | 25.11.2014 | C | CA2724736 | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | CA2626807 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101238738B | 17.08.2011 | B | CN101238738 | 06.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101243716B | 02.01.2013 | B | CN101243716 | 13.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101278496B | 12.04.2017 | B | CN101278496 | 01.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346922B | 22.02.2012 | B | CN101346922 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42302 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346938B | 20.06.2012 | B | CN101346938 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41900 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346939B | 08.05.2013 | B | CN101346939 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42083 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346944B | 16.04.2014 | B | CN101346944 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41982 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346951B | 01.05.2013 | B | CN101346951 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41933 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346952B | 18.05.2011 | B | CN101346952 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US42032 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346953B | 25.05.2011 | B | CN101346953 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41785 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347025B | 13.02.2013 | B | CN101347025 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41931 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347035B | 04.07.2012 | B | CN101347035 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US41869 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101351997B | 31.08.2011 | B | CN101351997 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42310 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101351998B | 21.11.2012 | B | CN101351998 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42599 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101351999B | 06.07.2011 | B | CN101351999 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41910 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352071B | 18.04.2012 | B | CN101352071 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42113 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352075B | 19.06.2013 | B | CN101352075 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42322 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352080B | 15.02.2012 | B | CN101352080 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41731 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352083B | 26.12.2012 | B | CN101352083 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41942 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352088B | 04.07.2012 | B | CN101352088 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42025 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105656611B | 25.10.2019 | B | CN105656611 | 08.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | CN200680048759 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105722202B | 07.06.2019 | B | CN105722202 | 29.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200680016064 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006010593D1 | 31.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41785 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006014298D1 | 24.06.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42067 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006014714D1 | 15.07.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41942 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006021772D1 | 16.06.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US42079 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2749425T | 20.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | WO2006US42055 | 27.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1221091 | 19.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE045538T | 30.12.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007011358 | 10.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007015924 | 06.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007016008 | 07.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY142994 | 14.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20075252L | 10.12.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2006US09549 | 15.03.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ564296 | 30.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23587 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ564390 | 25.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | WO2006US23483 | 16.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1946593T | 30.11.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41942 | 27.10.2006 | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | EP06826837 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2369965 | 10.10.2009 | C2 | RU2007138028 | 20.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2387101 | 20.04.2010 | C2 | RU2008101649 | 27.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2404546 | 20.11.2010 | C2 | RU2008101664 | 27.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201508533Y | 27.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10202109177P | 28.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG162749 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG166774 | 29.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI317580B | 21.11.2009 | B | TW200703959 | 16.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI345927B | 21.07.2011 | B | TW200709706 | 01.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI367038B | 21.06.2012 | B | TW200718239 | 01.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200729800 | 01.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | US36946606 | 07.03.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI413385B | 21.10.2013 | B | TW200733660 | 01.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US55296606 | 25.10.2006 | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA89086 | 25.12.2009 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US69146905 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA90905 | 10.06.2010 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US69190105 | 16.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA91048 | 25.06.2010 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US66230105 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050917 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050916 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050915 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050914 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050912 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050912 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050911 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050910 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050910 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050909 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050908 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050906 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050905 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050903 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050903 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050901 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050901 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050900 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050900 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050899 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050899 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050898 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050897 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050897 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050896 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050894 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050894 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050890 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050888 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050887 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050887 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050880 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050880 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050879 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050878 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050876 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050876 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050875 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050874 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050872 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050872 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050870 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A3 | WO2007050870 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050864 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050863 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050859 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050858 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A3 | WO2007050858 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050857 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050855 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050855 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050854 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050853 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050852 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A3 | WO2007050852 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050850 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050848 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050846 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050845 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050845 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050844 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050844 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050842 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050842 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050841 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050838 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050838 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050837 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050835 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050834 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050833 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050833 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050832 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050832 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050830 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050829 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050828 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050824 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050823 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050821 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050821 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050820 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050819 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050819 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050818 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050818 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050813 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050813 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050809 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050807 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050807 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050806 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050806 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050805 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2007 | A3 | WO2007050805 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050804 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2008 | A9 | WO2007050804 | 12.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050804 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050803 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050758 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050757 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2008 | A8 | WO2007050757 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050753 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050753 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050752 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050751 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2007 | A3 | WO2007050751 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050749 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050748 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A3 | WO2007050748 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050733 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050730 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050729 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050728 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050727 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050676 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110014669 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110010146 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110010137 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110002890 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100130229 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100129782 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100089890 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080072682 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070703 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070700 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070698 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070692 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070688 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070042 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070034 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070033 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080070028 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080069658 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080069651 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080069645 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080069638 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101070210B | Global Dossier | 06.10.2011 | B1 | KR20080070715 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101033781B | Global Dossier | 13.05.2011 | B1 | KR20080060293 | 01.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101033432B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2011 | B1 | KR20080064188 | 08.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101029955B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2011 | B1 | KR20080070041 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101025462B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2011 | B1 | KR20080070718 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101025461B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2011 | B1 | KR20080070029 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101022998B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B1 | KR20080069641 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101021448B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B1 | KR20080070713 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101013355B | Global Dossier | 14.02.2011 | B1 | KR20080070040 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101013354B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2011 | B1 | KR20080070693 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101013353B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2011 | B1 | KR20080069656 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101013343B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2011 | B1 | KR20080069636 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101013341B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2011 | B1 | KR20080069643 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101012631B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2011 | B1 | KR20080070043 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101011954B | Global Dossier | 31.01.2011 | B1 | KR20080070030 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101008862B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2011 | B1 | KR20080069652 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101007528B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2011 | B1 | KR20080069653 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101002198B | Global Dossier | 20.12.2010 | B1 | KR20080069642 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101001116B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2010 | B1 | KR20080070695 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100994652B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2010 | B1 | KR20080070027 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100994088B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2010 | B1 | KR20080070720 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100994087B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2010 | B1 | KR20080070716 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100994086B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2010 | B1 | KR20080070706 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100994085B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2010 | B1 | KR20080070694 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100994084B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2010 | B1 | KR20080069633 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100986946B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2010 | B1 | KR20080072681 | 06.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100982147B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2010 | B1 | KR20080069644 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US36946605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100977430B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2010 | B1 | KR20080069657 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100973456B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2010 | B1 | KR20080069634 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100973455B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2010 | B1 | KR20080069650 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100972330B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2010 | B1 | KR20080070719 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100972329B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2010 | B1 | KR20080070038 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100972328B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2010 | B1 | KR20080069637 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100970365B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2010 | B1 | KR20080059333 | 26.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100965451B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | B1 | KR20080069639 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100965450B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | B1 | KR20080070031 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100965449B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | B1 | KR20080069632 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100965448B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | B1 | KR20080070039 | 29.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100958564B | Global Dossier | 18.05.2010 | B1 | KR20080070704 | 30.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100947798B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2010 | B1 | KR20080061410 | 02.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100942403B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2010 | B1 | KR20080072680 | 06.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100939953B | Global Dossier | 04.02.2010 | B1 | KR20080069640 | 28.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015084533 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014042322 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013081205 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5836882B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2015 | B2 | JP2012170139 | 06.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012138907 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012090322 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012070422 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011182445 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101297577 | 29.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US36946605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346900 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346921 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346941 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346942 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346943 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346959 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73102805 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346963 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347011 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347023 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347024 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347026 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347027 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347028 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347030 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347032 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347033 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347034 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347036 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101347037 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101351761 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352000 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352001 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352068 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352069 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352070 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352072 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352073 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352074 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352076 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352077 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352079 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352081 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352082 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352084 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352085 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352086 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352087 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101361388 | 04.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101361389 | 04.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101366310 | 11.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101461167 | 17.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101627577 | 13.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73103705 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2333909T | 02.03.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2342196T | 02.07.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2344319T | 24.08.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US73112605 | 27.10.2005 |