EP1952661 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CALCULATING THE PAGING CYCLE OFFSET IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAKASH, Rajat 8730 Costa Verde Blvd., Apt. 2439 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
ULUPINAR, Fatih 17387 Grandee Place San Diego, CA 92128 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06836689.7 | 27.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US42418 | Priority number, date | US20050731126P | 27.10.2005 Original published format: US 731126 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007051043 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952661 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
H04W52/0235 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/382 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0028 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0675 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0803 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0869 (EP,US);
H04L65/00 (KR);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L41/083 (EP,US);
Y02D30/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BERECHNEN DES PAGING-ZYKLUS-OFFSET IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2008/32] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CALCULATING THE PAGING CYCLE OFFSET IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2008/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A CALCULER LE DECALAGE DE CYCLE DE RADIOMESSAGERIE DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0013451 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2004229605 (HWANG SUNG-OH [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084]; figure 3 *; | [X] - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT 2 "3GPP2", "cdma2000 High Rate Packet Data Air Interface Specification", 3GPP2 C.S0024-A VERSION 2.0, (200507), XP002429115 [X] 1-7 * pages 8-54 - pages 8-56 * | [A] - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT 2 "3GPP2", "Medium Access Control (MAC) Standard for cdma2000 Spread Spectrum Systems, Release D", 3GPP2 C.S0003-D VERSION 2.0, (200509), XP002429116 [A] 1-7 * pages 2-85 - pages 2-86 * | [PX] - TOMCIK J ET AL, "QFDD and QTDD: Proposed Draft Air Interface Specification, chapter 6, Lower MAC Control Sublayer", IEEE C802.20-05/69, XX, XX, (20051028), pages I - XXXI,1, XP002423447 [PX] 1-7 * pages 6-19 * |