EP1942981 - DELIVERY OF AGENTS TO TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Healthcare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-1544 / US | [2017/24] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Bayer Medical Care Inc. 1 Bayer Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | ||
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states MEDRAD, INC. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UBER, Arthur E., III 7426 Ben Hur Street Pittsburgh, PA 15208 / US | 02 /
TROMBLEY, Frederick W., III 5750 Phillips Road Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 03 /
GELBLUM, Eugene A. 1217 East End Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US | 04 /
RHINEHART, Edward J. 1780 McClure Road Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 05 /
REILLY, David M. 2318 Middle Road Glenshaw, PA 15116 / US | 06 /
CEDARHOLM, Page 6562 Bartlett Street Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US | 07 /
COWAN, Kevin P. 4242 Estates Court Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | 08 /
TROCKI, Mark 130 Reaghard Drive Cheswick, PA 15024 / US | 09 /
HIRSCHMAN, Alan D. 101 Candlewyck Drive Glenshaw, PA 15116 / US | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06836954.5 | 06.11.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006US43134 | Priority number, date | US20050734035P | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 734035 P | US20050742224P | 05.12.2005 Original published format: US 742224 P | US20060771206P | 07.02.2006 Original published format: US 771206 P | US20060460635 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: US 460635 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007053779 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1942981 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/30, A61M31/00, A01N1/02, C12M1/12, C12M1/24, B65D25/04, A01N1/00, C12M3/00, B65D1/24 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
A61J1/1443 (US);
A61J1/1456 (US);
A61J1/1475 (US);
A61M31/005 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US);
A61M5/3145 (US);
B01L3/502 (US);
B01L2300/044 (US);
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | A61M31/00, A01N1/02, C12M1/12, C12M1/24, B65D25/04, A01N1/00, C12M3/00, B65D1/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | ABGABE VON MITTELN AN GEWEBE | [2008/29] | English: | DELIVERY OF AGENTS TO TISSUE | [2008/29] | French: | ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS AUX TISSUS | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 22.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/26] | 04.05.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/26] | Appeal following examination | 04.07.2013 | Appeal received No. T2013/13 | 12.09.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.05.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9851369 (EDWARDS STUART D [US]) [A] 1-9,13 * page 7, line 16 - page 11, line 5; figures 1-5 * * page 14, line 17 - page 17, line 9; figures 11A,12A * * page 27, line 1 - page 28, line 29; figures 20-22 *; | [XI]US6599274 (KUCHARCZYK JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 30; figure 1 * * column 8, line 64 - column 10, line 13 * [I] 2,3,5-8,13; | [A]US2005070874 (MATSUDA HIKARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9,13* paragraphs [0180] - [0189] - [0210] - [0232]; figures 2-15 * | International search | [X]US2005124975 (LAW PETER K [CA]); | [X]US2004228764 (STEPHENS DALE [AU], et al); | [X]US5882343 (WILSON ROBERT F [US], et al); | [Y]US2004122366 (KAZEMZADEH FARHAD [US]) |