EP1943059 - ARTICULATING DRILL WITH OPTICAL SPEED CONTROL AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POZGAY, David 2025 Sherman Ave., NO. 509 Evnaston, IL 60201 / US | 02 /
DECICCO, John 19 Inner Circle Drive Des Plaines, IL 60016 / US | 03 /
KOVARIK, Iiya 425 S. Hart Street Palatine, IL 60067 / US | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06836955.2 | 03.11.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006US43141 | Priority number, date | US20050733546P | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 733546 P | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007056251 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1943059 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943059 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02, B25B21/00, B25B23/14, H01H9/06, H02P7/29 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US);
B25B21/00 (EP,US);
B25B23/14 (EP,US);
H01H9/061 (EP,US);
H02P7/29 (EP,US);
Y10S388/937 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | B25F5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/48] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELENKBOHRER MIT OPTISCHER DREHZAHLSTEUERUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/29] | English: | ARTICULATING DRILL WITH OPTICAL SPEED CONTROL AND METHOD OF OPERATION | [2008/29] | French: | PERCEUSE ARTICULEE AVEC COMMANDE DE VITESSE OTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 05.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003034164 (RUDOLF BORIS [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,10-17 * paragraphs [0187] - [0194]; figures 1-12 * [Y] 7-9,18-20; | [YA]GB1495808 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 7-9,18-20 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 105; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-6,10-17; | [AD] - FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR, "QRD1113/1114 - REFLECTIVE OBJECT SENSOR", INTERNET ARTICLE, (2000), URL: http://www.datasheetcatalog.com/datasheets_pdf/Q/R/D/1/QRD1114.shtml, (20070423), XP002428935 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004041531 | EP1319478 | US3475676 | US2003221684 | by applicant | US2003034164 | US2004041531 | GB1495808 | EP1319478 | US3475676 | US2003221684 |