18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
18.01.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
10.02.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
20.01.2012 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2011 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
19.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.05.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
26.05.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.05.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.12.2010 |
First examination report |
|
22.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
27.06.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
21.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|