EP1948139 - COATABLE COMPOSITIONS, COATINGS DERIVED THEREFROM AND MICROARRAYS HAVING SUCH COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLTER, James T. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SIMONS, John K. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Peter R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06837818.1 | 17.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US44553 | Priority number, date | WO2005US41858 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: PCT/US2005/041858 | US20050753617P | 23.12.2005 Original published format: US 753617 P | US20050754786P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 754786 P | US20060747618P | 18.05.2006 Original published format: US 747618 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007061781 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948139 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00, B05D1/00, A61K9/00 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A61K9/0021 (EP,US);
A61M37/0015 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0023 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0046 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | A61K9/28, A61K39/00, A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | ÜBERZIEHBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DARAUS ERHALTENE ÜBERZÜGE UND MIKROANORDNUNGEN MIT DIESEN ÜBERZÜGEN | [2008/31] | English: | COATABLE COMPOSITIONS, COATINGS DERIVED THEREFROM AND MICROARRAYS HAVING SUCH COATINGS | [2008/31] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUVANT ÊTRE REVÊTUES, REVÊTEMENTS DÉRIVÉS DE CELLES-CI ET MICRO-RÉSEAUX COMPRENANT DE TELS REVÊTEMENTS | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 01.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 26.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/30] | 12.03.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004060473 (ALZA CORP [US]) [I] 1-12* the whole document *; | [I]US2005153873 (CHAN KEITH T [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2003135201 (GONNELLI ROBERT R [US]); | [A]US6689100 (CONNELLY ROBERT I [US], et al); | [A]US6511463 (WOOD ROBERT L [US], et al) | Examination | EP1392389 | US2005123565 | US2005256045 |