EP1959757 - CHEWING GUM WITH HIGH-POTENCY SWEETENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Change - refusal | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company One Coca-Cola Plaza N.W. Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAKASH, Indra 9750 Talisman Drive Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 02 /
DUBOIS, Grant, E. 215 Quincy Lane Roswell, GA 30076 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Bittner, Thomas L., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06837853.8 | 17.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006US44599 | Priority number, date | US20050739302P | 23.11.2005 Original published format: US 739302 P | US20050739124P | 23.11.2005 Original published format: US 739124 P | US20060805209P | 19.06.2006 Original published format: US 805209 P | US20060805216P | 19.06.2006 Original published format: US 805216 P | US20060556084 | 02.11.2006 Original published format: US 556084 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007061809 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1959757 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, A23G4/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
A23G4/10 (EP,US);
A23G4/20 (EP,US);
A23L27/36 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/258, A23V2200/16, A23V2250/02, A23V2250/06 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/258, A23V2250/6418, A23V2250/642 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/262 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUGUMMI MIT SÜSSMITTEL MIT HOHER SÜSSKRAFT | [2008/35] | English: | CHEWING GUM WITH HIGH-POTENCY SWEETENER | [2008/35] | French: | CHEWING GUM AVEC EDULCORANT TRES PUISSANT | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 28.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/36] | 21.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/50] | 01.05.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004028270 (GUMLINK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,22-28,35-40 * page 25, line 6 - page 30, line 15 * [Y] 2,8,12-21,29-34; | [XY]US2004234648 (MAZUREK PAMELA M [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,22-28,35-40 * tables I-III * [Y] 2,8,12-21,29-34; | [X]WO0059543 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,22,25-28,35,36 * page 17, line 26 - page 23, line 17 *; | [X]US2005008732 (GEBRESELASSIE PETROS [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9-11,22-27,35,36 * example 1 *; | [X]WO2004028265 (GUMLINK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,22-28 * example 5 *; | [X]EP1474995 (GUMLINK AS [DK]) [X] 1,3-7,11,22-28,35-38 * [0015] - [0018]; example 1 *; | [XY]US6773730 (LIU JINGPING [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,22-28,35-40 * column 9, line 10 - column 10, line 7; examples 11 and 12 * [Y] 2,8,12-21,29-34; | [Y]US2003138519 (HILL VALERIE ANNE [US], et al) [Y] 2,8,12-21,29-34 * [0043] - [0053]; example; claims 1-20 * |