EP1951885 - IN SITU FRUCTOOLIGOSACCHARIDE PRODUCTION AND SUCROSE REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danisco US Inc. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2021/07] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Wayne E. GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
KING, William GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 03 /
SHETTY, Jayarama K. GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2021/09] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
HENDERSON, Wayne E. GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
02 /
KING, William GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
03 /
SHETTY, Jayarama K. GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/09] |
Former [2008/32] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06838004.7 | 17.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US44813 | Priority number, date | US20050738701P | 22.11.2005 Original published format: US 738701 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007061918 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1951885 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951885 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04, C12P19/18, C12N9/10, C07H3/06, A23L2/02 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
C12P19/18 (EP,KR,US);
C12P19/04 (KR);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L29/32 (EP,US);
C07H3/06 (EP,US);
C12N9/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN-SITU-FRUCTOOLIGOSACCHARID-ERZEUGUNG UND SUCROSE-REDUKTION | [2008/32] | English: | IN SITU FRUCTOOLIGOSACCHARIDE PRODUCTION AND SUCROSE REDUCTION | [2008/32] | French: | PRODUCTION DE FRUCTO-OLICOSACCHARIDES ET REDUCTION DE SUCROSE IN SITU | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2006 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | ES | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | TR | 03.03.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | IE | 17.11.2021 | LU | 17.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 17.11.2006 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08173109 ; | [X]JPH04229186 ; | [X]EP0307158 (JAPAN MAIZE PROD [JP]) [X] 1-5,15 * claims 1, 2, 10 and 11 *; | [X] - HANG Y D ET AL, "Optimization of enzymatic production of fructo-oligosaccharides from sucrose", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), Database accession no. PREV199699230037, XP002423975 [X] 1,2,8,11,15 * abstract * | [ ] - LEBENSMITTEL-WISSENSCHAFT AND TECHNOLOGIE, (1996), vol. 29, no. 5-6, ISSN 0023-6438, pages 578 - 580 | [X] - HANG Y D ET AL, "Fructosyltransferase activity of commercial enzyme preparations used in fruit juice processing", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1995), Database accession no. PREV199598405781, XP002423974 [X] 1,2,8,11,15 * abstract * | [ ] - BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (1995), vol. 17, no. 7, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 741 - 744 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 37, Database accession no. 1996-365541, XP002423980 & JPH08173109 A 19960709 (FUKUOKA KEN) [X] 1,2,11,14,15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 39, Database accession no. 1992-321181, XP002423981 & JPH04229186 A 19920818 (NIPPON OLIGO KK) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * |