EP1952298 - MOBILE SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURO, Anthony Patrick, II 12615 Darkwood Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06838162.3 | 20.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US45030 | Priority number, date | US20050283360 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: US 283360 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007062020 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952298 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/02 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
G06F21/79 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (KR);
H04L9/32 (KR);
G06F2221/2105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | MOBILES SICHERHEITSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2008/32] | English: | MOBILE SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2008/32] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SECURITE NOMADE | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 14.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2404263 (YUEN FOONG PAPER CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0027] * * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2405007 (RITECH INTERNAT LTD [HK]) [X] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005091520 (KHAN MOINUL H [US], et al) [A] 8,19-22,31-36,44-46,48 * the whole document *; | [A]US6728880 (SITES RICHARD L [US]) [A] 8,27-30,36,44-46,48 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005138409 (SHERIFF TAYIB [US], et al) [A] 37-43,45-49 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003225960 (GUU MORRIS [TW], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0023] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0075759 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 8,19-22,31-46,48,49 * page 1 - page 15 *; | [A]WO2004075525 (ASE R & D EUROP [BE], et al) [A] 8,27-30,36,44-46,48 * abstract * |