EP1955458 - SOCIAL AND INTERACTIVE APPLICATIONS FOR MASS MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINK, Michael 17 Osborne Rd. Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 02 /
BALUJA, Shumeet 853 East River Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 03 /
COVELL, Michele 2150 Dartmouth Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2008/33] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06838488.2 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006US45551 | Priority number, date | US20050740760P | 29.11.2005 Original published format: US 740760 P | US20060823881P | 29.08.2006 Original published format: US 823881 P | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007064641 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955458 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955458 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
G06F16/635 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (KR);
H04N21/44213 (US);
G06F16/683 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
H04H60/37 (EP,KR,US);
H04H60/372 (EP,US);
H04H60/375 (EP,US);
H04H60/58 (EP,US);
H04H60/59 (EP,US);
H04H60/64 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/26603 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4143 (EP,US);
H04N21/42203 (EP,US);
H04N21/4394 (EP,US);
H04N21/44016 (EP,US);
H04N21/440236 (EP,US);
H04N21/4542 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4756 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/4828 (EP,US);
H04N21/8106 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8133 (EP,US);
H04N21/858 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
H04H20/14 (EP,US);
H04H2201/90 (EP,US);
H04H60/06 (EP,US);
H04H60/45 (EP,US);
H04H60/65 (EP,US);
H04H60/66 (EP,US);
H04H60/80 (EP,US);
H04H60/87 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | G06F13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/33] | H04H9/00, H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | SOZIALE UND INTERAKTIVE ANWENDUNGEN FÜR MASSENMEDIEN | [2008/33] | English: | SOCIAL AND INTERACTIVE APPLICATIONS FOR MASS MEDIA | [2008/33] | French: | APPLICATIONS SOCIALES ET INTERACTIVES POUR MEDIA DE MASSE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 20.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08153719.3 / EP1986145 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2006 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | LU | 27.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
LU | 27.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004031058 (REISMAN RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-32 * figure 2a * * paragraphs [0265] , [0266] , [0499] , [0560] - [0564] - [0576] , [0580] * * claims 50,53-55 *; | [X]US2004199387 (WANG AVERY LI-CHUN [US], et al) [X] 1-32* paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0024] , [0056] , [0080] , [0101] - [0159] *; | [DX] - YAN KE ET AL, "Computer Vision for Music Identification", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2005. CVPR 2005. IEEE COMPUTE R SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 20-26 JUNE 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050620), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7695-2372-9, pages 597 - 604, XP010817327 [DX] 1-32 * Section 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2005.105 | International search | [Y]US2002023020 (KENYON STEPHEN C [US], et al); | [Y]US2002133499 (WARD SEAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2003093790 (LOGAN JAMES D [US], et al); | [Y]US6585521 (OBRADOR PERE [US]); | [Y]US2004025174 (CERRATO DEAN E [US]); | [X]US2005147256 (PETERS GEOFFREY W [US], et al); | [Y] - YANG, CHEN., "MACS: Music Audio Characteristic Sequence Indexing for Similarity Retrieval", IEEE WORKSHOP ON APPLICATIONS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING TO AUDIO AND ACOUSTICS, (2001), XP010566890 | by applicant | US2002133499 | US2004031058 | US2004199387 | US2005147256 | - YAN KE ET AL., "Computer Vision for Music Identification", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, pages 597 - 604 |