EP1954981 - SEMICONDUCTOR-BASED LIGHTING SYSTEMS AND LIGHTING SYSTEM COMPONENTS FOR AUTOMOTIVE USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna International Inc. 337 Magna Drive Aurora, ON L4G 7K1 / CA | [2016/39] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Magna International Inc. 337 Magna Drive Aurora, ON L4G 7K1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Chris 5821 Cote St Luc, Apt n°8 Hampstead, QC H3X 2G2 / CA | 02 /
LAMBERT, Chad, D. 265 Bleecker Avenue Belleville, ON K8N 3V3 / CA | 03 /
WOODWARD, Ronald, O. 107 Nansemond Turn Yorktown, VA 23693 / US | 04 /
CUNNIEN, Cole, J. 39525 Peters Drive Canton, MI 48187 / US | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
WILSON, Chris 286 Foster Avenue Belleville, ON K8N 3R5 / CA | ||
02 /
LAMBERT, Chad, D. 265 Bleecker Avenue Belleville, ON K8N 3V3 / CA | |||
03 /
WOODWARD, Ronald, O. 107 Nansemond Turn Yorktown, VA 23693 / US | |||
04 /
CUNNIEN, Cole, J. 39525 Peters Drive Canton, MI 48187 / US | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Deissler, K. Michael Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06838631.7 | 28.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006US45766 | Priority number, date | US20050740125P | 28.11.2005 Original published format: US 740125 P | US20060393023 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: US 393023 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007062277 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954981 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1954981 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/00, F21S8/10, F21S8/12 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
F21S41/143 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0041 (EP,US);
F21S41/24 (EP,US);
F21S41/27 (EP,US);
F21S41/28 (EP,US);
F21S41/663 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
F21V29/89 (EP,US);
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/0028 (EP,US);
G02B6/0073 (EP,US);
G02F1/133308 (US);
F21S45/47 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2016/39] |
Former [2008/51] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEME AUF HALBLEITERGRUNDLAGE UND BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEMKOMPONENTEN FÜR DEN KFZ-EINSATZ | [2008/33] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR-BASED LIGHTING SYSTEMS AND LIGHTING SYSTEM COMPONENTS FOR AUTOMOTIVE USE | [2008/33] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ECLAIRAGE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET ELEMENTS DE SYSTEMES D'ECLAIRAGE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DESTINES A DES AUTOMOBILES | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 01.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.04.2016 | 18.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]FR2855866 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * page 4, line 23 - line 31 * * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 15; figures 1-4 * [X] 10,11,13,14; | [Y]US2004149998 (HENSON GORDON D [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] - [0015] - [0021] , [0038] , [0039] , [0043] , [0094] , [0104] , [0117]; figures 1,13,14 *; | [Y]EP1213178 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0041]; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]DE10062103 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0018] - [0021]; figure 1 *; | [XY]FR2797678 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 10,15-17,19 * page 5, line 4 - page 8, line 31 * * page 13, lines 3-10; figures 1-3,9 * [Y] 7,9; | [X]US2005018446 (ISHIDA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 10,12,15,17,18 * paragraphs [0042] - [0062]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0678699 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 6 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 28 * * column 10, line 41 - column 12, line 29; figures 2,3,7,9 * | Examination | JP2002033011 | EP1535299 | JP2000149608 | by applicant | FR2855866 | US2004149998 | US20060393023 | US20050740125 |