EP1960086 - LOW PRESSURE DROP COATED DIESEL EXHAUST FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | ||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states CORNING INC. 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEALL, Douglas M 39 Overbrook Road Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 02 /
HEIBEL, Achim K Po Box 1459 Corning, New York 14830 / US | 03 /
TAO, Tinghong 165 Davenport Road Big Flats, New York 14814 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm GbR Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06839161.4 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006US46744 | Priority number, date | US20050751062P | 16.12.2005 Original published format: US 751062 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007070344 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960086 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24, B01D53/94, B01J37/02, F01N3/025, F01N3/035 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/02] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER DIESELABGASFILTER MIT GERINGEM DRUCKVERLUST | [2008/35] | English: | LOW PRESSURE DROP COATED DIESEL EXHAUST FILTER | [2008/35] | French: | FILTRE D'ECHAPPEMENT DIESEL REVETU A FAIBLE CHUTE DE PRESSION | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/05] | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04197422 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [X]EP0766993 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,14-18 * column 3, line 6 - line 19; figures 5,6 * * column 7, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]DE29808664U (WOLFGANG MERTNER INH ING KURT [DE]) [A] 1-18 * page 4, line 20 - line 30 *; | [X]JP2004243189 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,11 * abstract * |