EP1966105 - MULTI-FUNCTION COMPOSITION FOR SETTABLE COMPOSITE MATERIALS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states James Hardie International Finance B.V. Atrium Building 8th Floor Strawinskylaan 3077 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISCAN, Giang 15373 Aveiro Road Fontana, CA 92337 / US | 02 /
HOJAJI, Hamid 2140 Bonnie Brae Avenue Claremont, CA 91711 / US | 03 /
NAJI, Basil 7A Marcia Street Toongabble, NSW 2146 / AU | 04 /
PARAKALA, Padmaja 9 Oatlands Street Wentworthville, NSW-2145 / AU | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Schupfner, Georg, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Schupfner, Georg, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | O'Brien, Simon Warwick, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06839257.0 | 08.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006US47046 | Priority number, date | US20050299330 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: US 299330 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007070427 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1966105 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
C04B18/027 (EP,US);
C04B28/26 (EP,KR,US);
C04B26/02 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B40/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/027, C04B12/04 (EP,US);
C04B18/027, C04B14/04, C04B22/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ABBINDEFÄHIGE VERBUNDMATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/37] | English: | MULTI-FUNCTION COMPOSITION FOR SETTABLE COMPOSITE MATERIALS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE COMPOSITION | [2008/37] | French: | COMPOSITION MULTIFONCTIONNELLE POUR MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES DURCISSABLES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 28.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4501830 (MILLER RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,15-16,18 * column 1, line 47 - line 56 * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 44 - line 67 *; | [X]US2004079260 (DATTA AMLAN [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0016] , [0022] - [0024] - [0045] , [0050] , [0056] , [0057] , [0075] - [0077] - [0085] , [0106] - [0108] - [0129] , [0130]; table 6 *; | [A]US2005235883 (MERKLEY DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0033] , [0047] , [0058] , [0062] , [0070] , [0103] , [0111] *; | [X] - V.ZIVICA, "High effective silica fume alkali activator", BULL.MATER.SCI., (200404), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 179 - 182, XP002527133 [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13,15-17 * Introduction: 3rd paragraph * * Experimental: 2nd and 3rd paragraph *;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02708502 | International search | [X]US2005235883 (MERKLEY DONALD J [US], et al) |