EP2007318 - ACETABULAR CUP ASSEMBLY FOR MULTIPLE BEARING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 East Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2013/46] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Charles, Wayne 7596 Brittnay Drive Southaven, Mississippi 38671 / US | 02 /
CAPRIOTTI, Jason, A. 100 Nichols Boulevard Senatobia, Mississippi 38668 / US | 03 /
CROXTON, Michael, A. 2411 Yester Oaks Germantown, Tennessee 38139 / US | 04 /
ASHTON, Roger, William, Frank Leamington Spa Warwick Warwickshire CV31 3HL / GB | 05 /
WAUGH, Justin, M. 5036 Welchshire Avenue Memphis, Tennessee 38117 / US | 06 /
SHEA, Jeffrey, J. 2059 Shadowood Cove Memphis, Tennessee 38119 / US | 07 /
SRINIVASAN, Sureshkumar 1321 River Bank Drive Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US | 08 /
WALTERSDORFF, William, L. 590 Northwood Hills Road Hernando, Mississippi 38632 / US | 09 /
MCLEAN, Terry, W. 282 Green Arrow Cove Cordova, Tennessee 38018 / US | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Curran, Clair Smith & Nephew UK Limited Research Centre York Science Park Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | [2012/30] |
Former [2009/01] | Adcocks, Clair Smith & Nephew UK Limited Research Centre York Science Park Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06839455.0 | 18.10.2006 | [2009/01] | WO2006US60044 | Priority number, date | US20060783937P | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 783937 P | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007108848 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2007318 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2007318 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2007318 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/32, A61F2/34, A61F2/46 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/4609 (US);
A61F2/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/4637 (EP,US);
A61F2/4684 (EP,US);
A61B17/68 (EP,US);
A61B17/86 (EP,US);
A61F2/30744 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30321 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30331 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30367 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30378 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30403 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30474 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30487 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/305 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3052 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3054 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30578 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30607 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30822 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30827 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30906 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30925 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3093 (US);
A61F2002/30968 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3216 (US);
A61F2002/3241 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3401 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3403 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4632 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4641 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4666 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4681 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4688 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0062 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00029 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00167 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00179 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00203 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00239 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00395 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | A61F2/34, A61F2/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÜFTPFANNEN-ANORDNUNG FÜR MULTIPLE LAGERMATERIALIEN | [2009/01] | English: | ACETABULAR CUP ASSEMBLY FOR MULTIPLE BEARING MATERIALS | [2009/01] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE CUPULE ACÉTABULAIRE POUR MATÉRIAUX D'APPUI MULTIPLES | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2006 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | LU | 18.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/25] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2159416 (TRONZO RAYMOND G) [X] 1,2,6,8,15 * page 3, line 62 - line 66 * * page 4, line 1 - line 21 * * claims 1-3,9,14 * * figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP0245527 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,6,15 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 21 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5310408 (SCHRYVER JEFF [US], et al) [Y] 5,7 * abstract * * column 6, line 21 - line 34 * * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP1308141 (PERMEDICA S P A [IT]) [X] 1-4,6,13-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] * * figures 1,5,6,12 * [Y] 5,7; | [A]US6589284 (SILBERER PAUL [DE]) [A] * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 12 * * claim 1 ** figures 2,4 *; | [A]US2005288793 (DONG NICHOLAS N G [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0034] * * figures 1,1A * |