EP1938652 - A MULTI-HOP WIRELESS MESH NETWORK MEDIUM ACCESS CONTROL PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGRAWAL, Avneesh 7891 Doug Hill San Diego, California 92127 / US | 02 /
JULIAN, David, Jonathan 17515 Fairlie Road San Diego, California 92128 / US | 03 /
JAIN, Nikhil 5 Coldhill Road South, Ste. 28 Mendham, New Jersey 07945 / US | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2020/21] |
Former [2013/03] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Lucey, Michael, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06839478.2 | 19.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US60090 | Priority number, date | US20050728439P | 19.10.2005 Original published format: US 728439 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007048118 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938652 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938652 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W52/32, // H04W72/04, H04W84/18 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
H04W74/0816 (EP,US);
H04W52/325 (EP,US);
H04W74/0808 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/21] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIENZUGANGSSTEUERUNGSPROTOKOLL FÜR EIN DRAHTLOSES MULTIHOP-MESH-NETZWERK | [2008/27] | English: | A MULTI-HOP WIRELESS MESH NETWORK MEDIUM ACCESS CONTROL PROTOCOL | [2008/27] | French: | PROTOCOLE DE GESTION DES ACCES AUX MEDIA POUR RESEAU MAILLE SANS FIL A SAUTS MULTIPLES | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 10.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2019 | 08.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2006 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | IT | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | IE | 19.10.2020 | LU | 19.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 20.05.2020 | |
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002191573 (WHITEHILL ERIC A [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,9-14,17,23-27,33,37-41 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0071] * * figure - *; | [XY]US2005002355 (TAKANO HIROAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8,15,16,18-22,28-32,34-36,42-46 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,9-14,17,23-27,33,37-41; | [A]US2005169232 (SAKODA KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0138] *; | [A] - DAJI QIAO ET AL, "Adaptive transmit power control in IEEE 802.11a wireless LANs", VTC 2003-SPRING. THE 57TH. IEEE SEMIANNUAL VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. JEJU, KOREA, APRIL 22 - 25, 2003, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030422), VOL. 4 OF 4. CONF. 57, ISBN 0-7803-7757-5, pages 433 - 437, XP010862163 [A] 1-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2003.1207577 | Examination | US2003016698 | US2003210672 | WO2005050918 | by applicant | US2002191573 | US2005002355 |