14.03.2014 |
Refusal of application |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
13.12.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
25.11.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.11.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
20.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
02.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.10.2011 |
First examination report |
|
25.07.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.12.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
03.12.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
29.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
02.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.01.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] |
03.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
19.09.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
11.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
15.07.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|